Motley Broom v. College Park, Georgia
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Tiffany R Johnson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00937 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 6:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
College Park, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bianca Motley Broom
|
Represented By
|
1. | College Park Mayor Bianca Motley Broom Files Federal Lawsuit Against Own City Council Over Reduced Powers (hoodline.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/05/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 14-21, 2025, by Alexandra M. Joseph. (Joseph, Alexandra) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() RESPONSE re31 Order, Certification of Compliance filed by Bianca Motley Broom. (Balch, Christopher) |
|
33 | 33
![]() CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Joseph, Alexandra) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Pico-Prats, Javier) |
|
31 | 31
![]() GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CIVIL CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE TIFFANY R. JOHNSON. Within seven (7) days of entry of this Order in your case, you are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the attached Certificate of Compliance. (bgt) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2025 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Wed 01/08 9:59 AM
Submission of15 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Tiffany R Johnson. (pdt) |
||
Tuesday, January 07, 2025 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 01/08 9:57 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Tiffany R Johnson. Judge Michael L. Brown no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-937-TRJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (pdt) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 11, 12, 13, 2024; October 3, 2024; October 4, 2024; October 17, 18, 2024; November 14, 15, 2024, by Joshua Barrett Belinfante. (Belinfante, Joshua) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 8-9, August 29 - September 3, 2024., by Alexandra M. Joseph. (Joseph, Alexandra) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20-2024 June 25, 26, 27, 28-2024 July 22, 23-2024 August 23, 24, 25, 26-2024 September 27, 2024, by Joshua Barrett Belinfante. (Belinfante, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Wed 05/15 2:29 PM
Submission of15 MOTION to Dismiss,20 Response in Opposition to Motion, and27 Reply Brief to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (pdt) |
||
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() REPLY BRIEF re15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by College Park, Georgia. (Belinfante, Joshua) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief and DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiff's6 Motion to Disqualify Winston Denmark and Firm of Denmark Asby From Appearing or Representing Defendant Due to Unwaivable Conflict of Interest. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/10/2024. (jpk) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING22 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to a six-month discovery track. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2(A), the six-month discovery period will begin to run upon resolution of the pending15 motion to dismiss and any subsequent answer filed by Defendant. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/9/2024. (kng) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Initial Disclosures by Bianca Motley Broom.(Balch, Christopher) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Initial Disclosures by College Park, Georgia.(Joseph, Alexandra) |
|
22 | 22
![]() JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by College Park, Georgia. (Joseph, Alexandra) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by College Park, Georgia. (Joseph, Alexandra) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bianca Motley Broom. (Balch, Christopher) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Belinfante, Joshua) |
|
18 | 18
![]() RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Order,,, Set Submission Deadline,, filed by Bianca Motley Broom. (Balch, Christopher) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against College Park, Georgia filed by Bianca Motley Broom.(Balch, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
16 | 16
![]() STIPULATION re15 MOTION to Dismiss , Order,,, Set Submission Deadline,, to permit filing of Second Amended Complaint, allowing currently filed motion to dismiss to operate as response to Second Amended Complaint, and setting time for response to Motion to dismiss to April 29, 2024 by Bianca Motley Broom. (Balch, Christopher) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by College Park, Georgia.(Belinfante, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline
Mon 04/08 5:00 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only): The Court ORDERS the parties, within seven (7) days from the date of this Order, to each file a supplemental brief, no longer than 5 pages double-spaced, addressing the effect (if any) Plaintiff's filing her amended complaint (Dkt. 13) has on the pending motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. 5). Specifically, the parties should discuss whether the amendment moots the motion and, if not, how Plaintiff's additional allegations should affect the Court's analysis. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/8/2024. (jpk) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() RESPONSE re Submission to District Judge Stipulation of Mootness regarding motion to disqualify Winston Denmark and Denmark Ashby Law Firm filed by Bianca Motley Broom. (Balch, Christopher) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bianca Motley Broom.(Balch, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Javier Pico-Prats on behalf of College Park, Georgia (Pico-Prats, Javier) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael L. Brown: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2024 on Plaintiff's5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief. A separate order is forthcoming. Hearing Concluded. (Court Reporter Jana Colter)(kng) |
|
10 | 10
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by College Park, Georgia.(Belinfante, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joseph on behalf of College Park, Georgia (Joseph, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Return of Service Executed by Bianca Motley Broom. College Park, Georgia served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (Balch, Christopher) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Barrett Belinfante on behalf of College Park, Georgia (Belinfante, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION to Disqualify Winston Denmark and Firm of Denmark Asby from Appearing or Representing Defendant due to Unwaivable Conflict of Interest by Bianca Motley Broom. (kng) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED , and Injunctive Relief with Brief In Support by Bianca Motley Broom.(kng) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bianca Motley Broom identifying Other Affiliate Denmark Ashby Attorneys for Bianca Motley Broom. (kng) |
|
3 | 3
![]() STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Electronic Summons Issued as to College Park, Georgia. (kng) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed by Bianca Motley Broom. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13261919)(kng) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Fri 03/01 4:41 PM
Submission of5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED and Injunctive Relief,6 MOTION to Disqualify Attorney, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (kng) |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Fri 03/01 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Hearing (by docket entry only): The Court SETS a hearing on Plaintiff's5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED and Injunctive Relief for 3/6/2024 at 11:15 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk) |