South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-00848
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 17, 2024 8:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
BASF Corp
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133
Plaintiff
Franklin Monroe Greene
Represented By
Amanda D Summerlin
Taylor Martino PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/22 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Franklin Monroe Greene, Walter Johnson Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03213-RMG, 2:24-cv-00848-RMG(Summerlin, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 03/01 11:57 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 2/19/2024), Franklin Monroe Greene v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00848-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Jersey (sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/01 2:51 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cwhi, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11598003.), filed by Franklin Monroe Greene. Service due by 5/20/2024(cwhi, )
Related: [-]