California Central District Court
Judge:Consuelo B Marshall
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:24-cv-01632
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 2:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Blinds to Go (US) Inc.
Represented By
Helena Marie Guye
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Neal L Slifkin
Harris Beach LLP
contact info
Laura W Smalley
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Blinds to Go Inc.
Represented By
Helena Marie Guye
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Neal L Slifkin
Harris Beach LLP
contact info
Laura W Smalley
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Stephen Shiller
Terminated: 06/02/2024
Defendant
Nkere Udofia
Terminated: 06/02/2024


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
118 118 motion Sanctions Mon 04/28 6:23 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions filed by DEFENDANTS Blinds to Go (US) Inc., Blinds to Go Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Guye, Helena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Laura W. Smalley,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
117 117 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 04/23 11:47 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION109 AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT110 UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. The Court finds that the motions, currently scheduled for hearing on 4/29/2025, are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. No appearances are necessary. A written order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
Related: [-]