California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00046
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 02, 2024 11:17 PM PST
Defendant
John James Jose (1)
Represented By
Richard A. Beshwate, Jr.
Law Offices Of Richard A. Beshwate, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Spivak, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Feb 20 2024
DETENTION ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/16/2024 as to John James Jose. (Rooney, M)[1:24-mj-00021-EPG]
GPO Apr 19 2024
Joint Status Report and STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to John James Jose (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from April 24, 2024, to June 26, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Jun 20 2024
Joint Status Report and STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to John James Jose (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from June 26, 2024, to August 14, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Jun 24 2024
APPEARANCE and COMPLIANCE BOND, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/20/2024 as to John James Jose. (Marrujo, C)
GPO Jun 24 2024
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS of RELEASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/20/2024. (Marrujo, C)
GPO Aug 12 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue and Exclude Time as to John James Jose (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/12/2024. The Court has read and considered the parties' stipulation to continue the status conference and exclude time. The Court finds there is good cause for the continuance so as to allow the defendant reasonable time to complete his review of the discovery and fully consider a pre-trial resolution of the case. The Court also finds that the interests of justice served by granting the continuance outweigh the interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Therefore, for good cause shown: (1) The status conference is continued from August 14, 2024, until October 23, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; and (2) The period from August 14, 2024, through October 23, 2024, shall be excluded pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 17.1; 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv). The parties stipulation is untimely, but nonetheless, in the interest of justice, the Court grants the continuance. Any future delay in timely submission of the stipulation may result in denial of the requested continuance. (Valdez, E)
GPO Oct 15 2024
Joint Status Report and STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to John James Jose (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/15/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from October 23, 2024, to January 22, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Jan 15 2025
Joint Status Report and STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to John James Jose (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/15/2025. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from January 22, 2025 to February 26, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Deputy Clerk EV)
GPO Jan 16 2025
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/16/25 GRANTING without prejudice the government's 41 Motion to Dismiss Count One of the Indictment. (Deputy Clerk AS)

Docket last updated: 03/03/2024 12:02 AM PST
Friday, February 16, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to John James Jose (1). (Xiong, J.) [1:24-mj-00021-EPG]
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT as to John James Jose held on 2/16/2024. Upon review of defendant's financial affidavit, the Office of the Federal Defender was appointed. Defendant advised of charges/rights; reading/advisement waived; true name stated as charged; denial entered. DETENTION HEARING as to John James Jose held on 2/16/2024. The matter of detention was argued and submitted, with the Court ordering defendant detained. PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION HEARING set for 3/1/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Government Counsel: Jeffrey Spivak present. Defense Counsel: Kara Ottervanger present. Custody Status: Custody - (FCJ - present in person). Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Sonitta Lout. (Rooney, M) [1:24-mj-00021-EPG]
Related: [-]
5 5 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 2/16/2024 as to John James Jose. (Lundstrom, T) [1:24-mj-00021-EPG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
4 4 DETENTION ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/16/2024 as to John James Jose. (Rooney, M) [1:24-mj-00021-EPG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
7 7 CJA 20 APPOINTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/28/2024 adding Richard A. Beshwate, Jr for John James Jose as to John James Jose. (Flores, E) [1:24-mj-00021-EPG]
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to John James Jose (1) count(s) 1, 2. (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs True Bill