California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00372
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 02, 2024 11:19 PM PST
Defendant
Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (2)
Represented By
Stephen D Lemish
contact info
Defendant
Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (1)
Represented By
Roxana Sandoval
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Gabriela Curiel-Lopez
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Material Witness
Josue David Guoz Alonzo
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Material Witness
Julian Rodriguez
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Material Witness
Moises Cristante Vizcarra-Angulo
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Material Witness
Luis Alberto Zamora Tirado
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David J. Kete
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Mar 08 2024
ORDER:Granting 42 Motion to Continue as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (1), Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (2) Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/7/24.(exs)ORDER:Granting 42 Motion to Continue as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (1), Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (2) Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/7/24.(exs)
GPO Mar 19 2024
ORDER TO DEPOSE MATERIAL WITNESS Luis Alberto Zamora Tirado, Moises Cristante Vizcarra-Angulo, Julian Rodriguez, Jose David Guoz Alonzo, and Gabriela Curiel-Lopez, as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera, Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes: The material witnesses being held in custody in case number 24-CR-00372-W, shall be deposed no later than April 18, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/19/2024. (exs)ORDER TO DEPOSE MATERIAL WITNESS Luis Alberto Zamora Tirado, Moises Cristante Vizcarra-Angulo, Julian Rodriguez, Jose David Guoz Alonzo, and Gabriela Curiel-Lopez, as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera, Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes: The material witnesses being held in custody in case number 24-CR-00372-W, shall be deposed no later than April 18, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/19/2024. (exs)
GPO Jun 24 2024
JUDGMENT as to Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (2). Custody BOP for a term of 8 months. 1 year Supervised Release. $100.00 Assessment. $5,000.00 JVTA waived. No fine. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan (pdc)
GPO Aug 05 2024
JUDGMENT as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (1). Count 11: Custody BOP for a term of 8 months. No Supervised Release. $100.00 Assessment waived. No fine. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (pdc)

Docket last updated: 03/03/2024 12:05 AM PST
Thursday, February 01, 2024
Arrest of Jesus Penuelas-Rivera, Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera, Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes.(fjp) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Michael S Pedretti for Luis Alberto Zamora Tirado, Michael S Pedretti for Moises Cristante Vizcarra-Angulo, Michael S Pedretti for Julian Rodriguez, Michael S Pedretti for Josue David Guoz Alonzo, Michael S Pedretti for Gabriela Curiel-Lopez appointed. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera, Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes: Initial Appearance set for 2/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David J. Kete appearing for USA. (Kete, David)Attorney David J. Kete added to party USA(pty:pla) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Initial Appearance as to Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (2) held on 2/2/2024. Appointed Attorney Stephen D Lemish(n/a) for Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes(2). Government oral motion to detain(Flight). ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 2/6/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.) Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 2/15/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel. E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 2/29/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.) (Interpreter Mylene Green). (CD# 2/2/2024 DEB 24-1:2:46-3:04). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura Berumen AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Mayra Lopez FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB]
Related: [-]
6 6 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes(2). (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/2/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (cxl) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (cxl) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB]
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Initial Appearance as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (1) held on 2/2/2024. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Jesus Penuelas-Rivera. Detention Hearing as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera held on 2/2/2024. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion granted as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Bond set as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (1) No Bail. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 2/15/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel. E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 2/29/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.) (Interpreter Mylene Green). (CD# 2/2/2024 DEB 24-1:2:46-3:34). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura Berumen AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Mayra Lopez FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
12 12 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/2/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/2/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
10 10 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera, Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes: Arraignment of MW - Josue David Guoz Alonzo, Moises Cristante Vizcarra-Angulo, and Luis Alberto Zamora Tirado set for 2/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Roxana Sandoval appearing for Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (Sandoval, Roxana)Attorney Roxana Sandoval added to party Jesus Penuelas-Rivera(pty:dft) (ggv). [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Arraignment of Material Witnesses Luis Alberto Zamora Tirado, Moises Cristante Vizcarra-Angulo, Josue David Guoz Alonzo held on 2/5/2024. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Michael Pedretti(n/a). Material Witness bail set as to each at $5,000 PS w/10% percent cash deposit. (Interpreter Ariela Edelson Torenberg, Cynthia Herber). (CD# 2/5/2024 SBC 24-1:2:04-2:08). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura Berumen AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Moises Cristante Vizcarra-Angulo. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/5/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Josue David Guoz Alonzo. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/5/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Luis Alberto Zamora Tirado. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/5/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher:Detention Hearing as to Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes held on 2/6/2024. USA oral motion for detention - Moot. Defendant stipulates to detention and is ordered detained without prejudice. ; Defense oral motion to continue Preliminary Hearing granted.( Preliminary Hearing continued to 2/29/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher). (Interpreter Cynthia Herber). (CD# 2/6/2024 DEB 24 2:10-2:12). (Plaintiff Attorney Hunter Norton AUSA-S/A). (Defendant Attorney Stephen Lemish CJA). (no document attached) (acc) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 02/06/2024. (stn) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
22 22 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 2/2/2024 (Sandoval, Roxana) (stn). [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
23 23 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera, Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes: Arraignment of MW - Julian Rodriguez and Gabriela Curiel-Lopez set for 2/9/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (fjp) Modified on 2/9/2024 (fjp). [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
24 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Arraignment of Material Witnesses Julian Rodriguez, Gabriela Curiel-Lopez held on 2/9/2024. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Michael Pedretti(n/a). Material Witness bail set as to each at $5,000 PS w/10% percent cash deposit. (Interpreter Paula Navarro-Gomez). (CD# 2/9/2024 SBC 24-1:2:08-2:15). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura Berumen AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Julian Rodriguez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS (10% deposit). Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/9/24. (ecf) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Gabriela Curiel-Lopez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS (10% deposit). Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 2/9/24. (ecf) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
27 27 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera. Preliminary Hearing set for 2/29/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 02/13/2024. (ggv) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
28 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Initial Appearance as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera held on 2/2/2024, before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Court Reporter/Transcriber: James C. Pence-Aviles. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/6/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2024. (jcp)(jrd) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
29 29 Amended COMPLAINT as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera, Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes. AMENDED PROBABLE CAUSE STATEMENT (fjp) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 18, 2024
30 30 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION (Conditions of Release/Detention - G.O. 627), to District Court by Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (Sandoval, Roxana) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
31 31 MINUTE ORDER OF JUDGE TRANSFER in case as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera. Judge Linda Lopez assigned for appeal proceedings. The new case number is 24mj358-DEB-LL. Motions referred to Linda Lopez.(no document attached) (sjt) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule, as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera,re30 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION (Conditions of Release/Detention - G.O. 627), to District Court by Jesus Penuelas-Rivera : Responses due by 2/27/2024 Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5D before Judge Linda Lopez. (no document attached) (rla) [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
33 33 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 2/2/24 by USA (Kete, David) (stn). [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
34 34 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera re30 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION (Conditions of Release/Detention - G.O. 627), to District Court by Jesus Penuelas-Rivera(Kete, David) (stn). [3:24-mj-00358-DEB-LL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
35 35 INDICTMENT as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (1) count(s) 1, 2-6, 7-11, Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (2) count(s) 1, 2-6, 7-11.(rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Indictment
Thursday, February 29, 2024
36 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Arraignment on Indictment as to Jesus Penuelas-Rivera (1) Count 1,2-6,7-11 and Luis Antonio Cervantes Soberanes (2) Count 1,2-6,7-11 held on 2/29/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Setting set for 3/11/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Interpreter Matias Pizarro). (CD# 2/29/2024 DEB 24 2:31-2:38). (Plaintiff Attorney Hunter Norton AUSA-S/A). (Defendant Attorney Stephen Piotrkowski FD-S/A; William Burgener CJA-S/A). (Material Witness Attorney Michael Pedretti CJA). (acc)
Related: [-]