California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00354
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 02, 2024 11:31 PM PST
Defendant
Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Mara Gonzalez Souto
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
David J. Kete
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Feb 05 2025
JUDGMENT as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (1). Count(s) 1, Custody of the BOP for a term of 12 months and 1 day. Supervised Release for a term of 3 years (18 months home detention). $100 assessment imposed. No fine. Signed by Judge John A. Houston. (aef)

Docket last updated: 03/03/2024 12:22 AM PST
Thursday, February 01, 2024
Arrest of Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo.(fjp) [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo: Initial Appearance set for 2/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David J. Kete appearing for USA. (Kete, David)Attorney David J. Kete added to party USA(pty:pla) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
4 4 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Initial Appearance as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo held on 2/2/2024. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo. Bond set as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA. Bond due by 2/9/24. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 2/15/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel. E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 2/29/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. )(Interpreter Mylene Green, Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 2/2/2024 DEB 24-1:1:55-2:45). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura Berumen AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Mayra Lopez FD-S/A). (aje) Modified on 2/5/2024 to remove abstract being issued language (aje). [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/2/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (cxl) [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/2/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mara Gonzalez Souto appearing for Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (Gonzalez Souto, Mara)Attorney Mara Gonzalez Souto added to party Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo(pty:dft) (ggv). [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (Gonzalez Souto, Mara) (ggv). [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
11 11 $15,000 PS Bond secured by 1 FRRA filed as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (Document applicable to USA, Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo.) (jms) (acc). [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/6/2024) Complete Bond submitted 2/6/2024
12 12 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo re11 Bond. (jms) [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
13 13 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo. Preliminary Hearing set for 2/29/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 2/13/2024. (rxc) (sjt). [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
14 14 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF15 *** NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Kete, David) (stn). [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by USA as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (Kete, David)(stn). [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Kete, David) (stn). [3:24-mj-00347-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
17 17 INFORMATION as to Ana Karina Pulido Rebollo (1) count(s) 1. (acc)
Related: [-]