Texas Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00053
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2024 1:35 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alan M. Buie
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Alberth (1)
Terminated: 02/02/2024


Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 8:56 PM CST
Friday, February 02, 2024
1 1 Arrest (Rule 5/Rule 32.1) of John Alberth (lt)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to John Alberth. (Buie, Alan)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by John Alberth (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (lt)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to John Alberth held on 2/2/2024. Waived identity hearing, elects to have further hearings in Houston. Waiver Filed. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR Gold - ERO.) (lt)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER - Rule 5 as to John Alberth. (lt)
Related: [-]
6 6 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to John Alberth. Defendant committed to SDTX, Houston Division. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (lt)
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice to of a Rule 5 Appearance as to John Alberth. Your case number is: 4:24-cr-00037. Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to TXWD_ECF_help@txwd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (lt)
Related: [-]