New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:24-cv-01358
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Enforcement of Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
BKUK REALTY LLC
Represented By
JEFFREY IAN WASSERMAN
Wasserman Legal LLC
contact info
Defendant
DIA MANAGEMENT FIRM LLC
1401 44th Street
North Bergen, NJ 07047
Represented By
JEFFREY IAN WASSERMAN
Wasserman Legal LLC
contact info
Defendant
BESIM KUKAJ
Represented By
JEFFREY IAN WASSERMAN
Wasserman Legal LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIO ASITIMBAY
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NICOLAS ZHAGNAY
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CESAR SUPACELA
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PELLUMB KATANOLLI
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DIEGO A. ESTRADA
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JENARO CAMPOVERDE
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SEGUNDO CALLE
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VLADIMIR YUNGA
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EDUARDO YUNGA
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FELIPE VEGA-LOYOLA
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MILTON QUIZHPILEMA
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EDISON MACANCELA
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRYAN MACANCELA
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMUEL HERRERA
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EDER GORDILLO
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VICTOR GONZALEZ
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
YONI DE LOS SANTOS
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PAULINO CARPINTERO
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ABRAHAM CAMPOS
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CRISTIAN ASITIMBAY
Represented By
ADAM L POLLOCK
Pollock Cohen LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
31 31 order Text Order Tue 05/06 1:25 PM
TEXT ORDER-- As Defendant DIA Investment Group LLC's bankruptcy case has been dismissed (see 24-cv-1358 at ECF No.30 ), the stay is hereby lifted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 5/6/2025. (JB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
30 30 misc Letter Wed 04/30 3:57 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel. (POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
29 29 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 04/28 11:02 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Compel and Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 4/25/2025. (mj)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Mon 04/28 11:08 AM
Status Conference set for 6/9/2025 at 02:00 PM via videoconference before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. (mj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Thu 04/17 11:25 AM
Letter from all parties regarding discovery status. (POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
27 27 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Thu 03/27 2:29 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ABRAHAM CAMPOS re23 First MOTION to Compel (POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
26 26 misc Substitution of Attorney Wed 03/19 12:12 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JEFFREY IAN WASSERMAN terminated. Attorney ADAM SHERMAN for BKUK REALTY LLC,ADAM SHERMAN for DIA MANAGEMENT FIRM LLC,ADAM SHERMAN for BESIM KUKAJ added.. (SHERMAN, ADAM)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/19 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM SHERMAN on behalf of BKUK REALTY LLC, DIA MANAGEMENT FIRM LLC, BESIM KUKAJ (SHERMAN, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
24 24 respm Certification in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/10 2:48 PM
CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by All Defendants re23 First MOTION to Compel (WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/06 2:26 PM
Set Deadlines as to23 First MOTION to Compel. Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
23 23 motion Compel Mon 03/03 2:54 PM
First MOTION to Compel by All Plaintiffs.(POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Pollock Declaration in Support
utility Motions Referred Mon 03/03 3:50 PM
23 First MOTION to Compel REFERRED to Stacey D. Adams. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 12/18 9:46 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrea Nishi to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15885738.) (POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Take Deposition Mon 12/16 3:27 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Take Deposition of Besim Kukaj, pursuant to the Rule 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 12/16/2024. (ld)
Related: [-]
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 3:24 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ANDREA NISHI, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 12/16/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/16 9:52 AM
Set Deadlines as to18 First MOTION to Take Deposition of Besim Kukaj . Motion set for 1/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (and)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
utility Motions Referred Thu 12/12 11:40 AM
18 First MOTION to Take Deposition of Besim Kukaj REFERRED to Stacey D. Adams. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
18 18 motion Take Deposition Wed 12/11 4:13 PM
First MOTION to Take Deposition of Besim Kukaj by ABRAHAM CAMPOS. (POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
utility Motions Referred Fri 12/06 8:42 AM
17 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice REFERRED to Stacey D. Adams. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 12/12 11:37 AM
LETTER ORDER: This matter is stayed as to Defendant DIA Investment Group LLC ONLY. Fact discovery is extended to January 31,2025. (Status Conference set for 4/25/2025 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 12/5/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/05 2:24 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABRAHAM CAMPOS.(POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/05 4:38 PM
Set Deadlines as to17 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (and)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 12/10 11:03 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Status Conference held on 12/5/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
qc QC - Fillable PDF Wed 10/23 9:26 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by JEFFREY WASSERMAN on 10/22/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 10/22 3:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BKUK REALTY LLC, DIA MANAGEMENT FIRM LLC identifying n/a as Corporate Parent.. (WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/10 3:35 PM
CONSOLIDATED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 10/8/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order Thu 10/10 3:08 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Abraham Campos, et al. v. Dia Empire Group, Docket No. 23-cv-21802; Abraham Campos, et al. v. SP Realty Investments LLC, et al., Docket No. 22-cv-07426; and Abraham Campos, et al. v. Besim Kukaj, et al., Case No. 24-cv-01358 are hereby consolidated for purposes of discovery and case management only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 10/8/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
13 13 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 09/06 2:40 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by CRISTIAN ASITIMBAY, MARIO ASITIMBAY, SEGUNDO CALLE, ABRAHAM CAMPOS, JENARO CAMPOVERDE, PAULINO CARPINTERO, YONI DE LOS SANTOS, DIEGO A. ESTRADA, VICTOR GONZALEZ, EDER GORDILLO, SAMUEL HERRERA, PELLUMB KATANOLLI, BRYAN MACANCELA, EDISON MACANCELA, MILTON QUIZHPILEMA, CESAR SUPACELA, FELIPE VEGA-LOYOLA, EDUARDO YUNGA, VLADIMIR YUNGA, NICOLAS ZHAGNAY.(POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/16 4:45 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 8/13/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 09/03 7:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/13/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
11 11 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 08/08 7:37 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by CRISTIAN ASITIMBAY, MARIO ASITIMBAY, SEGUNDO CALLE, ABRAHAM CAMPOS, JENARO CAMPOVERDE, PAULINO CARPINTERO, YONI DE LOS SANTOS, DIEGO A. ESTRADA, VICTOR GONZALEZ, EDER GORDILLO, SAMUEL HERRERA, PELLUMB KATANOLLI, BRYAN MACANCELA, EDISON MACANCELA, MILTON QUIZHPILEMA, CESAR SUPACELA, FELIPE VEGA-LOYOLA, EDUARDO YUNGA, VLADIMIR YUNGA, NICOLAS ZHAGNAY.(POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/19 11:45 AM
LETTER ORDER: An initial scheduling conference shall be held via video conference on August 13, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Microsoft Teams login credentials will be provided. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found[LINK:here] . (Initial Conference set for 8/13/2024 at 10:30 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 7/19/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/08 3:37 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to the case. (mj)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/01 3:09 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ADAM SHERMAN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/1/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/01 12:27 PM
Set Deadlines as to8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/28 11:28 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants.(WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Jeffrey I. Wasserman In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Certification Certification of Adam Sherman In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Fri 06/28 1:22 PM
8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice REFERRED to Cathy L. Waldor. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/21 5:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BKUK REALTY LLC, DIA MANAGEMENT FIRM LLC, BESIM KUKAJ.(WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
6 6 order Stipulation and Order Tue 06/11 4:40 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer through 6/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/11/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 06/10 3:29 PM
STIPULATION by BKUK REALTY LLC, DIA MANAGEMENT FIRM LLC, BESIM KUKAJ. (WASSERMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/02 7:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CRISTIAN ASITIMBAY, JENARO CAMPOVERDE, MILTON QUIZHPILEMA, EDER GORDILLO, ABRAHAM CAMPOS, FELIPE VEGA-LOYOLA, EDUARDO YUNGA, VICTOR GONZALEZ, SEGUNDO CALLE, PAULINO CARPINTERO, CESAR SUPACELA, MARIO ASITIMBAY, VLADIMIR YUNGA, DIEGO A. ESTRADA, BRYAN MACANCELA, PELLUMB KATANOLLI, SAMUEL HERRERA, NICOLAS ZHAGNAY, EDISON MACANCELA, YONI DE LOS SANTOS. BESIM KUKAJ served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/01 1:51 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/04 2:57 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BKUK REALTY LLC, DIA MANAGEMENT FIRM LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/04 1:03 PM
NOTICE by CRISTIAN ASITIMBAY, MARIO ASITIMBAY, ABRAHAM CAMPOS, PAULINO CARPINTERO, Segundo Calle, Jenaro Campoverde, YONI DE LOS SANTOS, Diego A. Estrada, VICTOR GONZALEZ, EDER GORDILLO, SAMUEL HERRERA, Pellumb Katanolli, BRYAN MACANCELA, EDISON MACANCELA, MILTON QUIZHPILEMA, Cesar Supacela, FELIPE VEGA-LOYOLA, EDUARDO YUNGA, VLADIMIR YUNGA, Nicolas Zhagnay **Related Case Statement** (POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/04 12:28 PM
Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 03/04 2:36 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number NEW49812 (jr)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 03/03 10:41 PM
COMPLAINT against BKUK REALTY LLC, DIA MANAGEMENT FIRM LLC, BESIM KUKAJ with JURY DEMAND, filed by CRISTIAN ASITIMBAY, Jenaro Campoverde, MILTON QUIZHPILEMA, EDER GORDILLO, ABRAHAM CAMPOS, FELIPE VEGA-LOYOLA, EDUARDO YUNGA, VICTOR GONZALEZ, Segundo Calle, PAULINO CARPINTERO, Cesar Supacela, MARIO ASITIMBAY, VLADIMIR YUNGA, Diego A. Estrada, BRYAN MACANCELA, Pellumb Katanolli, SAMUEL HERRERA, Nicolas Zhagnay, EDISON MACANCELA, YONI DE LOS SANTOS.(POLLOCK, ADAM)
Related: [-]