22
|
|
22
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Reconsider
Sun 04/28 12:42 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Reconsider Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
order
Reconsider Order of Dismissal, Motion to
Thu 04/25 11:17 AM
Order Granting In Part And Denying In Part Debtors Motion To Reconsider The Order Of Dismissal, Or Its 180-Day Prohibition Against Refiling. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the request to reconsider the dismissal of the case is DENIED. The case stands dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the request to reconsider the 180-day bar to refiling is GRANTED. The bar to refiling is hereby reduced from 180 days to 26 days, ending on April 24, 2024. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 4/25/2024. (jlc)
|
20
|
|
20
misc
Proceedings Memorandum
Wed 04/24 4:55 PM
Proceedings Memorandum: Testimony only taken from Lacey Murray-Bullock, Owner. Appearances by Brad Fallon, Debtor Attorney, Alan Hinderleider, USTR and Jacob Machitar, Attorney for Creditor, BP Fast Lending. Order to be submitted re: Related [+] (nmw)
|
19
|
|
19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 10:28 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Lisa Wolgast on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but solely as Owner Trustee of SG Alternative Title Trust 2021-RTL1. (Wolgast, Lisa)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice
Thu 04/18 12:51 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Mon 04/15 4:00 PM
Certificate of Service of Order and Notice filed by Brad Fallon on behalf of Residential Adversities LLC. Related [+] (Fallon, Brad)
|
16
|
|
16
2
pgs
notice
Order and Notice
Mon 04/15 9:37 AM
Order and Notice That Debtors Request for Expedited hearing is GRANTED. Hearing to be held on 4/24/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta. Entered on 4/15/2024. Service by Debtor's Counsel. Related [+] (cws)
|
15
|
|
15
motion
Reconsider Order of Dismissal, Motion to
Fri 04/12 11:14 AM
Motion to Reconsider Dismissal Order or Its 180-Day Prohibition Against Refiling filed by Brad Fallon on behalf of Residential Adversities LLC. Related [+] (Fallon, Brad)
|
|
|
misc
Meeting of Creditors Not Held - Case Converted/Dismissed
Fri 04/05 12:52 PM
Meeting of creditors was not held because case has been converted or dismissed (aam)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice
Mon 04/01 12:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
order
06-Order Dismissing Case (Ineligible all chs. 180 days - 109(g))
Fri 03/29 7:29 AM
Order Dismissing Case and rendering debtor ineligible under Title 11 for 180 days. Service by BNC. Entered on 3/29/2024. (jlc)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees
Thu 03/07 12:51 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual
Thu 03/07 12:51 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding List of Creditors
Thu 03/07 12:51 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding List of Creditors Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors
Thu 03/07 12:51 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 03/05 12:51 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Alan Hinderleider on behalf of United States Trustee. Hearing to be held on 3/28/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta. Related [+](Hinderleider, Alan)
|
7
|
|
7
motion
05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)
Tue 03/05 12:45 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case With 180 Day Bar to Refiling filed by Alan Hinderleider on behalf of United States Trustee. (Hinderleider, Alan)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual)
Mon 03/04 1:46 PM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/18/2024. Schedule(s) A/B D E/ F G H due by 3/18/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 3/18/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 3/18/2024. Corporate Resolution due 3/18/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/18/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/18/2024. (cws)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding List of Creditors
Mon 03/04 1:44 PM
Order Regarding the List of Creditors with deficiencies noted. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of case without further notice. Service by BNC. List of all creditors due 3/11/2024. Entered on 3/4/2024. (cws)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees
Mon 03/04 1:42 PM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1,738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 3/4/2024. Related [+] (cws)
|
3
|
|
3
misc
03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/04 1:41 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 4/5/2024 at 09:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (cws)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/04 1:03 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Alan Hinderleider on behalf of United States Trustee. (Hinderleider, Alan)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
6
pgs
misc
Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/04 10:04 AM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by Residential Adversities LLC . Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/2/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 7/2/2024. (rfs) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2024 (rfs)
Related: [-]
|