Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:John R Adams
Case #: 5:24-cv-00401
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2024
Terminated:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Denise Ferguson
Plaintiff
Bruce Arnoff
A754939 Ross Correctional P.O. Box 70101
Chillicothe, OH 45601

GPO Apr 12 2024
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying as moot, Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2). Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. An appeal from his decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge John R. Adams on 4/11/24. (K,C)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, April 12, 2024
4 4 order Judgment Fri 04/12 12:16 PM
Judgment Entry in accordance with the Court's accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, thisaction is dismissed. The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that anappeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge John R. Adams on 4/11/24. (K,C)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Fri 04/12 11:49 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying as moot, Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. An appeal from his decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge John R. Adams on 4/11/24. (K,C)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Fri 04/12 1:08 PM
Copy of4 Judgment and3 Memorandum Opinion and Order mailed to Bruce Arnoff at Ross Correctional on 4/15/24. Related document(s)4 ,3 . (K,C)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/04 11:28 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Bruce Arnoff. Related document(s)1 .(P,G)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Indigency,
Att: 2 Exhibit C - Inmate Demand Statement,
Att: 3 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Layman Misrepresentation,
Att: 4 Exhibit E - Supreme Court of Ohio, Case Information
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/04 11:16 AM
Complaint with jury demand against Denise Ferguson. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Bruce Arnoff. (P,G) (P,G)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Page
Att: 3 (3/4/2024) Envelope
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 03/04 11:18 AM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (P,G)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 03/04 11:20 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (P,G)
Related: [-]