15
|
|
15
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case (403)
Sun 04/14 12:44 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Notice Date 04/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
order
Dismiss Case, Motion to
Thu 04/11 7:24 AM
Order GRANTING Motion to Dismiss Case. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 4/11/2024. (jlc)
|
|
|
misc
Meeting of Creditors Held but Continued
Fri 04/12 9:06 AM
Section 341(a) meeting held but continued for production of additional documents or information. 341 Meeting to be held on 4/19/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (jar)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/26 4:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Lisa Wolgast on behalf of Churchill Funding I LLC. (Wolgast, Lisa)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
misc
P-Equity Security Holders
Tue 03/26 10:34 AM
Equity Security Holders filed by Aubrey Properties LLC . Related [+] (rfs)
|
11
|
|
11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/15 9:40 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Ellen Shepherd on behalf of RELIABLE HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC DBA LENDZ FINANCIAL. (Shepherd, Ellen)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees
Fri 03/08 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Notice Date 03/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual
Fri 03/08 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 03/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors
Fri 03/08 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual)
Tue 03/05 10:51 AM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/18/2024. (cws)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees
Tue 03/05 10:43 AM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1,738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 3/5/2024. Related [+] (cws)
|
5
|
|
5
misc
03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)
Tue 03/05 10:11 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 4/4/2024 at 01:00 PM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (cws)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
motion
05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)
Tue 03/05 9:11 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case filed by David S. Weidenbaum on behalf of United States Trustee. Hearing to be held on 4/9/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1404, Atlanta. (Weidenbaum, David)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake
Tue 03/05 10:45 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Installment Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by RS. Receipt Number 10001584. Paid by Angela Oakley. (acr)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
P-Twenty (20) Largest Unsecured Creditors
Mon 03/04 5:10 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Aubrey Properties LLC . (rfs)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
P-Corporate Resolution
Mon 03/04 5:09 PM
Corporate Resolution filed by Aubrey Properties LLC . (rfs)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
misc
Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/04 12:04 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by Aubrey Properties LLC . Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/2/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 7/2/2024. (rfs)
Related: [-]
|