California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Case #: 2:24-cv-00675
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Apr 25, 2024
Case in other court:San Joaquin County Superior Court, STK-CV-UPI-24-00000
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Dameron Hospital Association
Represented By
Tammy Beth Webb
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Karima Carmona
Represented By
Kristen Lake Cardoso
Kopelowitz Ostrow P.A.
contact info

GPO Apr 02 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/2/2024 EXTENDING the deadline for Defendant's Responsive Pleading to 4/30/2024. (Clemente Licea, O)
GPO Apr 25 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/25/2024 REMANDING CASE to the Superior Court for the State of California, County of San Joaquin. Certified copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Murphy, J)

Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Thursday, April 25, 2024
14 14 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Case Remanded Thu 04/25 1:08 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/25/2024 REMANDING CASE to the Superior Court for the State of California, County of San Joaquin. Certified copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Murphy, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/23 3:50 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Remanding Action to State Court by Dameron Hospital Association. (Webb, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/02 11:53 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/2/2024 EXTENDING the deadline for Defendant's Responsive Pleading to 4/30/2024. (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
11 11 motion Remand Mon 04/01 12:48 PM
MOTION to REMAND and Alternative Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery by Karima Carmona. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.(Cardoso, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Kristen Lake Cardoso, Esq.,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Remanding Case
Friday, March 29, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/29 12:53 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Regarding Second Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Dameron Hospital Association. (Webb, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
9 9 misc Civil New Case Documents for KJM Tue 03/19 9:27 AM
AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
8 8 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Tue 03/19 9:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-0675 KJM DB. (Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 03/18 6:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Webb, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
6 6 order Minute Order Fri 03/08 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Law Clerk for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/08/2024: The parties' re5 Stipulation is granted. Defendant's response to the complaint shall be filed on or before March 31, 2024. (Text Only Entry)(Van Dine, B)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/08 11:40 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Dameron Hospital Association. (Webb, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
4 4 service Certificate / Proof of Service Mon 03/04 1:39 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Dameron Hospital Association re2 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider,3 Corporate Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal,. (Webb, Tammy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/04 11:10 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Dameron Hospital Association. (Webb, Tammy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Mon 03/04 8:50 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
Friday, March 01, 2024
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UPI-2024-0000527 by Defendant. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11378201) (Webb, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet