District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:24-cv-00607
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2024
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
RENA BITTER
Represented By
Fithawi Berhane
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
RUSSEL JOHN BROWN
Represented By
Fithawi Berhane
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By
Fithawi Berhane
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By
Fithawi Berhane
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES EMBASSY NEW DELHI
Represented By
Fithawi Berhane
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
Fithawi Berhane
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
MUDLAPUR KRISHNAMURTHY SUDERSHAN
Represented By
Brandon David Neuman
Global Immigration Partners
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, June 24, 2024
order .Order Mon 06/24 9:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Dkt.11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/24/2024. (lcrdm3)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 06/21 7:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MUDLAPUR KRISHNAMURTHY SUDERSHAN (Neuman, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/15 10:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's first consent motion for an extension of time, Dkt.10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss, Dkt.9 , on or before June 21, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/15/2024. (lcrdm3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Tue 05/14 1:11 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by MUDLAPUR KRISHNAMURTHY SUDERSHAN. (Neuman, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 05/06 3:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by RENA BITTER, ANTONY J. BLINKEN, RUSSEL JOHN BROWN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES EMBASSY NEW DELHI.(Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Fithawi Berhane on behalf of All Defendants (Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Fri 04/05 1:37 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/13/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/12/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/13/2024. (See Docket Entry6 to view document) (zjm)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 04/03 7:17 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RENA BITTER served on 3/12/2024; ANTONY J. BLINKEN served on 3/12/2024; RUSSEL JOHN BROWN served on 3/12/2024; MUDLAPUR KRISHNAMURTHY SUDERSHAN served on 3/13/2024; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/13/2024; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/12/2024; UNITED STATES EMBASSY NEW DELHI served on 3/12/2024 (Neuman, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
5 5 order .Order Standing Order Thu 03/14 9:15 AM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/14/2024. (lcrdm3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 03/06 4:44 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Wed 03/06 12:02 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MUDLAPUR KRISHNAMURTHY SUDERSHAN. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by MUDLAPUR KRISHNAMURTHY SUDERSHAN.(Neuman, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 03/05 1:02 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/05 12:58 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC- New Case Tue 03/05 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to bdn@gip-us.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (znmw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/04 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT with Petition for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10730550) filed by MUDLAPUR KRISHNAMURTHY SUDERSHAN.(Neuman, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Exhibit