Deaf Star Studios, LLC
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barbara Ellis-Monro |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-52337 |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Deaf Star Studios, LLC
741 Lambert Dr NE
Atlanta, GA 30324-4145 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Operating Report
Thu 04/25 9:06 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period: 03/05/2024 through 03/31/2024 filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice
Thu 04/25 12:52 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
40 | 40
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Set Hearing
Thu 04/25 12:52 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Set Hearing Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report
Mon 04/22 6:20 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
38 | 38
3
pgs
notice
Order and Notice
Mon 04/22 3:19 PM
Notice Of Subchapter V Election And Related Deadlines, And Order And Notice Of Status Conference. ORDERED that Debtor shall file the pre-status conference report not later than April 29, 2024. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for filing a proof of claim for all creditors (except a governmental unit) is May 13, 2024. Service by Counsel and BNC. Hearing to be held on 5/1/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1402, Atlanta. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] Entered on 4/22/2024. (jlc) |
|
37 | 37
order
Set Hearing, Motion to
Mon 04/22 2:47 PM
Order GRANTING Debtor's Motion for Emergency Hearing and Notice of Hearing. To be Served by Debtor's Counsel. Entered on 4/22/2024. Hearing to be held on 4/23/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1402, Atlanta. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] (mrw) Modified on 4/22/2024 (mrw) |
|
court
Miscellaneous Deficiencies
Mon 04/22 8:50 AM
Notice that the Amended Schedules filed by Natalyn M. Archibong is incorrect or deficient in the following manner: Missing Certificate of Service . (mrw) |
||
misc
Deadline for Filing Pre-Status Conference Report
Mon 04/22 3:26 PM
Deadline: Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 4/29/2024. (jlc) |
||
misc
Meeting of Creditors Held but Continued
Tue 04/23 10:09 AM
Section 341(a) meeting held but continued for production of additional documents or information. 341 Meeting to be held on 5/8/2024 at 01:00 PM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (jar) |
||
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Sun 04/21 10:43 PM
Certificate of Service of Amended Schedule D filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
35 | 35
misc
P-Declaration of Debtor
Sun 04/21 10:37 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
34 | 34
misc
P-Statement of Financial Affairs
Sun 04/21 10:34 PM
Amended Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
33 | 33
misc
P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities
Sun 04/21 10:32 PM
Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
32 | 32
misc
P-Amendment to Schedules D, E, F and/or E/F (FEE)
Sun 04/21 10:28 PM
Amendment to Schedules: Schedule D, (no creditors added) the value of collateral Fee $ 34 filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
31 | 31
misc
P-Schedule H
Sun 04/21 10:21 PM
Amended Schedule H filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
30 | 30
misc
P-Schedule A/B
Sun 04/21 10:20 PM
Amended Schedule A/B filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Federal Tax Return
Sun 04/21 8:15 PM
Federal Tax Return for the year 2023 filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Sun 04/21 10:30 PM
Receipt of Amendment to Schedules D,E,F and/or E/F (FEE)([LINK 24-52337 bem] ) [misc,729] ( 34.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A60923876. Fee Amount 34.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
misc
Deadline for Filing Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan
Fri 04/19 9:43 AM
Deadline: Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 7/15/2024. (jlc) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee
Wed 04/17 12:01 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Todd E. Hennings filed by Trustee. (Kolba, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Small Business Cash-Flow Statement
Tue 04/16 10:52 PM
Small Business Cash-Flow Statement filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
26 | 26
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Tue 04/16 10:49 PM
Certificate of Service of First Day Motions filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Set Hearing, Motion to
Tue 04/16 10:47 PM
Emergency Motion to Set Hearing on First Day Motions filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Pay Pre-Petition Claims, Motion to
Tue 04/16 10:29 PM
Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Claims filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts, Motion to
Tue 04/16 10:26 PM
Motion to Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
22 | 22
misc
P-Amendment to Voluntary Petition
Tue 04/16 6:13 PM
Amendment to Voluntary Petition to: Correct Statistical Information, with Certificate of Service and to elect to proceed under SubChapter V filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
Att: 1 Pleading Certificate of Service | ||
21 | 21
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Tue 04/16 1:26 PM
Certificate of Service of filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (BK)
Mon 04/15 1:13 PM
Notice of Bryan H. Keith's Notice of 30(B)(6) Deposition of Deaf Star Studios, LLC Filed by Eric J. Breithaupt on behalf of Bryan H. Keith. (Breithaupt, Eric) |
|
court
Miscellaneous Deficiencies
Mon 04/15 7:36 AM
Notice that the Certificate of Service filed by Natalyn M. Archibong is incorrect or deficient in the following manner: Case name or number does not match. (mrw) |
||
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Sat 04/13 12:35 PM
Certificate of Service of Order Approving Application of Professional, Subject to Objection filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ (408)
Fri 04/12 12:50 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Application to Employ
Tue 04/09 4:10 PM
Order Approving Application of Professional, Subject to Objection. . To be served by Counsel for Debtor. Entered on 4/9/2024. (mrw) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 4:10 PM
Notice of Appearance Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9010(B) Filed by Adam E. Ekbom on behalf of Bryan H. Keith. (Ekbom, Adam) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice (BK)
Mon 04/08 2:48 PM
Notice of Bryan H. Keith's Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena of Debtor Filed by Eric J. Breithaupt on behalf of Bryan H. Keith. (Breithaupt, Eric) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
misc
Meeting of Creditors Held but Continued
Fri 04/12 8:53 AM
Section 341(a) meeting held but continued for production of additional documents or information. 341 Meeting to be held on 4/22/2024 at 01:00 PM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (jar) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Small Business Balance Sheet
Thu 04/04 11:35 PM
Small Business Balance Sheet filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
13 | 13
4
pgs
motion
07-Application to Employ
Thu 04/04 11:08 PM
Application to Employ Natalyn M. Archibong as Attorney filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Natalyn Archibong | ||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
P-Statement of Financial Affairs
Mon 03/18 11:20 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
11 | 11
misc
P-Attorney Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/18 11:19 PM
Attorney Disclosure Statement , Schedule A/B , Schedule D , Schedule E/F , Schedule G , Schedule H , 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Mon 03/18 9:39 AM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay([LINK 24-52337 bem] ) [motion,185] ( 199.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A60716345. Fee Amount 199.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
00-Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE)
Wed 03/13 5:00 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay Fee $ 199, filed by Eric J. Breithaupt on behalf of Bryan H. Keith. Hearing to be held on 4/23/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1402, Atlanta. (Breithaupt, Eric) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice
Sat 03/09 12:52 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice. Notice Date 03/08/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual
Fri 03/08 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 03/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors
Fri 03/08 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of 341 Meeting Continued
Wed 03/06 11:26 AM
Notice Rescheduling Meeting of Creditors. Service by BNC. 341 Meeting to be held on 4/5/2024 at 12:00 PM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (jlc) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual)
Tue 03/05 10:41 AM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/18/2024. Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G, H due by 3/18/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 3/18/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 3/18/2024. Atty Disclosure State. due 3/18/2024. Corporate Resolution due 3/18/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/18/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/18/2024. Tax Return Date: 3/11/2024. Balance Sheet Date: 3/11/2024.Statement of Operations Due 3/11/2024Cash Flow Statement due 3/11/2024 (cws) |
|
4 | 4
misc
03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)
Tue 03/05 10:20 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 4/5/2024 at 01:00 PM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (cws) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/05 9:06 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Lindsay P. S. Kolba on behalf of United States Trustee. (Kolba, Lindsay) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Operating Report
Mon 03/04 5:39 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period: 03/04/2024 through 03/04/2024 filed by Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/04 5:13 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by Natalyn M. Archibong of Law Office of Natalyn M. Archibong on behalf of Deaf Star Studios, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 09/3/2024., Disclosure Statement due by 09/3/2024. (Archibong, Natalyn) |
|
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Mon 03/04 5:14 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-52337 ) [misc,4002aty] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A60632045. Fee Amount 1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |