Oregon District Court
Judge:Mark D Clarke
Case #: 1:24-cv-00399
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2024
Terminated:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 2:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Cord Bueker, Jr.
Represented By
Thomas H. Castelli
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Alexander Charles Jones
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Brian Detman
Represented By
Thomas H. Castelli
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Alexander Charles Jones
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Charlene Williams
Represented By
Thomas H. Castelli
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Alexander Charles Jones
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Youth 71Five Ministries
Represented By
Nathan B. Pogue
Bittner & Hahs, P.C.
contact info
Mark Lippelmann
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Jeremiah Galus
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
David A. Cortman
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Ryan J Tucker
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info

GPO Jun 26 2024
Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in this Opinion and Order, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 34 is granted, and Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 20 is denied. Defendants are entitled toqualified immunity. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered for the defendants. Signed on 06/26/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
GPO Jul 18 2024
Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal43 is DENIED. Signed on 7/18/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 18, 2024
46 46 2 pgs order Opinion and Order Thu 07/18 2:09 PM
Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal 43 is DENIED. Signed on 7/18/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
Related: [-]
45 45 resp Reply to Motion Thu 07/18 1:24 PM
Reply In Support of Plaintiff's to Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal 43 . Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Lippelmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
44 44 resp Response to Motion Wed 07/17 2:47 PM
Response to Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal 43 . Filed by Cord Bueker, Jr., Brian Detman, Charlene Williams. (Castelli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
43 43 motion Motion - Miscellaneous Wed 07/03 2:13 PM
Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal . Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Galus, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Bud Amundsen
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 07/03 3:20 PM
USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal41 . Case Appealed to 9th Circuit of Appeals Case Number 24-4101 assigned. (hm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
42 42 oth_doc Transcript of Proceedings Tue 07/02 1:34 PM
OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on 05/21/2024 before Judge Mark D. Clarke, Court Reporter Lindsey Weresch, lindsey_weresch@ord.uscourts.gov or (503)326-8047. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov . Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 7/9/2024. Redaction Request due 7/23/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2024. (Weresch, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
41 41 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 07/01 5:49 PM
Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit Filing fee $605 collected; Agency Tracking ID AORDC-9477155: . Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Galus, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Judgment - Terminate Case Mon 07/01 2:21 PM
JUDGMENT: . Judgment is entered in accordance with the Opinion and Order39 . Judgment shall be entered for defendants. Signed on 07/01/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
39 39 18 pgs order Opinion and Order Wed 06/26 2:00 PM
Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in this Opinion and Order, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss34 is granted, and Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction20 is denied. Defendants are entitled toqualified immunity. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered for the defendants. Signed on 06/26/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
minute Motion Hearing Held Tue 05/21 3:23 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing Held regarding Motion to Dismiss34 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction20 . Motion is taken under advisement as of 5/21/2024. Jeremiah Galus present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Thomas Castelli present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Lindsey Weresch. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
37 37 resp Reply to Motion Fri 05/17 11:35 AM
Reply In Support to Motion to Dismiss 34 . Filed by All Defendants. (Castelli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
36 36 resp Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/03 4:40 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss 34 . Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Lippelmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
35 35 resp Reply to Motion Fri 05/03 4:10 PM
Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 20 . Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Lippelmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Friday, April 12, 2024
34 34 motion Dismiss Fri 04/12 4:51 PM
Motion to Dismiss . Filed by All Defendants. (Castelli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
33 33 oth_sup Declaration Fri 04/12 4:47 PM
Declaration of Philip Hofmann in Support of Defendants' Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Castelli, Thomas)
Related: [-] Response to Motion31 .
Att: 1 Exhibit
32 32 oth_sup Declaration Fri 04/12 4:43 PM
Declaration of Brian Detman in Support of Defendants' Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Castelli, Thomas)
Related: [-] Response to Motion31 .
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
31 31 resp Response to Motion Fri 04/12 4:39 PM
Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 20 . Filed by Cord Bueker, Jr., Brian Detman, Charlene Williams. (Castelli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
minute Scheduling Conference Wed 04/03 10:27 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction,20 . Response is due by 5/3/2024. Reply is due by 5/17/2024. Telephonic Oral Argument is set for 5/21/2024 at 02:00PM (for both Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss (not yet filed)) before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Teleconference information to be provided in a separate entry. Mark Lippelmann present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Thomas Castelli present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Hearing was not recorded. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Mon 04/01 10:49 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer27 . Answer is due by 4/12/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Scheduling Mon 04/01 10:50 AM
Scheduling Order regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction 20 . Response is due by 4/12/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Thu 03/28 10:11 AM
Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,,1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Castelli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
order 1 - Scheduling Tue 03/26 10:55 AM
Scheduling Order: Based upon the Full Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge25 , the Motion for Preliminary Injunction20 is referred back to Magistrate Judge Clarke. Scheduling Conference regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction20 is set for 4/3/2024 at 10:00AM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (cp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
25 25 oth_evt Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge Fri 03/22 2:14 PM
Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
24 24 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 03/21 3:18 PM
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 03/21 9:05 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction 20 is referred to Honorable Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
22 22 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 03/20 12:52 PM
Notice of Appearance of Alexander Charles Jones appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Jones, Alexander)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 03/20 12:46 PM
Notice of Appearance of Thomas H. Castelli appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Castelli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 03/20 9:03 AM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Lippelmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Bud Amundsen in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunciton,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Bud Amundsen in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunciton
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
19 19 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Tue 03/19 1:58 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
18 18 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 03/14 4:06 PM
Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. (Galus, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 03/14 4:05 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Cord Bueker, Jr. served on 3/8/2024, answer due on 3/29/2024. (Galus, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 03/14 4:03 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Brian Detman served on 3/8/2024, answer due on 3/29/2024. (Galus, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 03/14 4:01 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Charlene Williams served on 3/8/2024, answer due on 3/29/2024. (Galus, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 03/06 8:38 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jeremiah Galus. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-930838713 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
Related: [-]
order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/06 8:41 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 13 . Jeremiah Galus on behalf of Youth 71Five Ministries. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
13 13 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 1:52 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jeremiah Galus. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9308387. Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Galus, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 03/05 9:38 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Cord Bueker, Jr., Brian Detman, Charlene Williams. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 7:20 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Mark Lippelmann. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9307033. Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Lippelmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 03/05 11:15 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David A. Cortman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-93068405 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
Related: [-]
order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 11:17 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 5 . David A. Cortman on behalf of Youth 71Five Ministries. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
Related: [-]
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 03/05 11:19 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ryan J Tucker. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-93069287 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
Related: [-]
order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 11:24 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 7 . Ryan J. Tucker on behalf of Youth 71Five Ministries. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
Related: [-]
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 03/05 11:33 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Mark Lippelmann. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-93070338 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
Related: [-]
order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 11:36 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 8 . Mark Lippelmann on behalf of Youth 71Five Ministries. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
7 7 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/04 5:02 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ryan J Tucker. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9306928. Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Tucker, Ryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons Mon 03/04 4:52 PM
Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Pogue, Nathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/04 4:39 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David A. Cortman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9306840. Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Cortman, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 Scheduling Order regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order,3 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 7/2/2024. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/1/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (hm)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Mon 03/04 4:34 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/2/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/1/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 8/1/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (hm)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/04 3:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries. (Pogue, Nathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/04 3:14 PM
Verified Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9306446 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Youth 71Five Ministries against All Defendants. (Pogue, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 12 Proposed Summons
order 1 - Scheduling Mon 03/04 4:36 PM
Scheduling Order regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order,3 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 7/2/2024. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/1/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (hm)
Related: [-]