336
|
|
336
claims
Certificate of Mailing - Limited User
Fri 04/26 1:56 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
|
335
|
|
335
claims
Certificate of Mailing - Limited User
Fri 04/26 11:06 AM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
|
334
|
|
334
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 04/26 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
333
|
|
333
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 04/26 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
332
|
|
332
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 04/26 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
331
|
|
331
claims
Certificate of Mailing - Limited User
Thu 04/25 7:32 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
|
330
|
|
330
claims
Certificate of Mailing - Limited User
Thu 04/25 2:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
|
329
|
|
329
claims
Certificate of Mailing - Limited User
Thu 04/25 1:06 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
|
328
|
|
328
claims
Certificate of Mailing - Limited User
Thu 04/25 12:55 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
|
|
|
utility
Remark re: Missing Documents Filed
Thu 04/25 2:26 PM
Remark Related [+]. STILL MISSING: Atty Disclosure Statement (eag)
|
|
|
utility
Pro Hac Vice Payment
Thu 04/25 3:09 PM
Pro Hac Vice Payment has been made to the US District Court in the amount of $250.00. Receipt Number 50106. Related [+]. (rah)
|
|
|
utility
Pro Hac Vice Payment
Thu 04/25 3:14 PM
Pro Hac Vice Payment has been made to the US District Court in the amount of $250.00. Receipt Number 50108. Related [+]. (rah)
|
327
|
|
327
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thu 04/25 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
326
|
|
326
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thu 04/25 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
325
|
|
325
misc
Document
Wed 04/24 6:04 PM
Document re: Declaration of Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr. on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Husch Blackwell LLP filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of BowFlex Inc.. (DiPasquale, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|
324
|
|
324
misc
Monthly Fee Statement
Wed 04/24 3:55 PM
Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of March 4, 2024 through March 31, 2024. Objection Date is May 15, 2024. Filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (DiPasquale, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
323
|
|
323
claims
Certificate of Mailing - Limited User
Tue 04/23 2:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
|
322
|
|
322
claims
Certificate of Mailing - Limited User
Tue 04/23 1:54 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
|
321
|
|
321
order
Amended Order (Generic)
Tue 04/23 12:41 PM
AMENDED ORDER AUTHORIZING THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS OF BOWFLEX INC., ET AL. TO RETAIN AND EMPLOY PROVINCE, LLC AS FINANCIAL ADVISOR, EFFECTIVE AS OF MARCH 21, 2024 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/23/2024. (har)
|
320
|
|
320
misc
Document
Tue 04/23 10:43 AM
Document re: Declaration of Jay Jung, on behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Embarc Advisors filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of BowFlex Inc.. (DiPasquale, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|
319
|
|
319
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 10:32 AM
Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney Jessica Kenney Bonteque as Special Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 4/23/2024. (har)
|
318
|
|
318
3
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Tue 04/23 8:50 AM
ORDER OVERRULING THE LIMITED OBJECTION BY SCHWINN ACQUISITION LLC TO ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF THE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AGREEMENT OF PACIFIC DIRECT, LLC Related [+] Approving the Auction and Bidding Procedures, (v) Approving Stalking Horse Bid Protections, (C) Scheduling Bid Deadlines and an Auction, (D) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (E) Approving the Form APA, and (II)(A) Establishing Notice and Procedures for the Assumption and Assignment of Contracts and Leases, (B) Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment of Assumed Contracts, (c) Authorizing the Sale of Assets and (D) Granting Related Relief Filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of BowFlex Inc. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/23/2024. (har)
|
|
|
utility
Pro Hac Vice Payment
Tue 04/23 2:59 PM
Pro Hac Vice Payment has been made to the US District Court in the amount of $250.00. Receipt Number 50097. Related [+]. (rah)
|
317
|
|
317
misc
Document
Mon 04/22 9:21 PM
Document re: Third Notice Of Potential Assumption And Assignment Of Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of BowFlex Inc.. (DiPasquale, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
316
|
|
316
misc
Document
Mon 04/22 6:49 PM
Document re: Notice of Closing of Sale Transaction filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of BowFlex Inc.. (DiPasquale, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|
315
|
|
315
order
Retention
Mon 04/22 3:37 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Province, LLC as FINANCIAL ADVISOR TO THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS EFFECTIVE AS OF MARCH 21, 2024 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/22/2024. (har)
|
314
|
|
314
order
Retention
Mon 04/22 3:32 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP as Attorney for OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS EFFECTIVE AS OF MARCH 19, 202 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/22/2024. (har) Modified on 4/22/2024 TO CORRECT DOCKET TEXT.
|
313
|
|
313
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Mon 04/22 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
312
|
|
312
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sun 04/21 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
311
|
|
311
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sun 04/21 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
310
|
|
310
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sun 04/21 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
309
|
|
309
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sun 04/21 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
308
|
|
308
misc
Document
Sat 04/20 1:30 PM
Document re: Notice of Final List of Assigned Contracts filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of BowFlex Inc.. (DiPasquale, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
307
|
|
307
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 3:28 PM
Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney Bryan T. Glover as Special Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 4/19/2024. (har)
|
306
|
|
306
misc
Document
Fri 04/19 2:51 PM
Document re: Declaration of Lee R. Osman, on behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course professional Dorsey & Whitney LLP filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of BowFlex Inc.. (DiPasquale, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|
305
|
|
305
misc
Document
Fri 04/19 1:48 PM
Document re: Declaration of Ulrich Worm, on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Mayer Brown LLP filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of BowFlex Inc.. (DiPasquale, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|