Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:24-mc-50204
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, July 18, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 07/18 10:05 AM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL NONPARTIES TO RESPOND TO SUBPOENA. **Please review service requirements contained in the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (KBro)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 07/18 10:17 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: For the reasons stated in Plaintiff's motion, including the minimal public interest in this information and the need to protect disclosure of non-party identifying information, ECF No.2 is GRANTED. Entered by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
7 7 notice Appearance Tue 03/19 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel A. Bernier on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bernier, Joel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
order Text-Only Order Wed 03/06 8:32 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper has initiated this action to compel compliance of a subpoena. Although Attorney Culpepper is admitted to the Eastern District of Michigan, he does not appear to be an active member of the State Bar of Michigan and, accordingly, must specify local counsel. See E.D. Mich. LR 83.20(f) (A member of the bar of this court who appears as attorney of record in the district court and is not an active member of the State Bar of Michigan must specify as local counsel a member of the bar of this court with an office in the district.). Attorney Culpepper is thus ORDERED to specify local counsel by having local counsel file an appearance by March 20, 2024. Entered by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
6 6 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 03/05 10:13 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs identifying Corporate Parent Hannibal Media, Inc. for Badhouse Studios, LLC; Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for Hitman Two Productions, Inc., LF2 Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc.; Other Affiliate Voltage Pictures, LLC for After II Movie, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, MON, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC, Wonder One, LLC; Corporate Parent Millennium Media, Inc. for Nikola Productions, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for Bodyguard Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc. for Screen Media Ventures, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge* Tue 03/05 9:43 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti:2 MOTION to Seal1 INITIATING MOTION Compel Nonparties to comply with subpoena by All Plaintiffs. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9696881 - Fee: $52 dollars filed by Cinelou Films, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, After II Movie, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., Hannibal Classics, Inc., Voltage Holdings, LLC, Hitman Two Productions, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Wonder One, LLC, LF2 Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Badhouse Studios, LLC, Millennium IP, Inc., Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Screen Media Ventures, LLC, MON, LLC, Nikola Productions, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc.,1 INITIATING MOTION Compel Nonparties to comply with subpoena by All Plaintiffs. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9696881 - Fee: $52 dollars filed by Cinelou Films, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, After II Movie, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., Hannibal Classics, Inc., Voltage Holdings, LLC, Hitman Two Productions, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Wonder One, LLC, LF2 Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Millennium IP, Inc., Badhouse Studios, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Screen Media Ventures, LLC, MON, LLC, Nikola Productions, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Sealed Exhibit Tue 03/05 12:10 AM
SEALED EXHIBIT "E" Schedule A list unredacted re2 MOTION to Seal1 INITIATING MOTION Compel Nonparties to comply with subpoena by All Plaintiffs. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9696881 - Fee: $52 dollars by All Plaintiffs. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Sealed Exhibit Tue 03/05 12:06 AM
SEALED EXHIBIT "D" (Unredacted Schedule "A") re2 MOTION to Seal1 INITIATING MOTION Compel Nonparties to comply with subpoena by All Plaintiffs. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9696881 - Fee: $52 dollars by All Plaintiffs. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Seal Tue 03/05 12:04 AM
MOTION to Seal1 INITIATING MOTION Compel Nonparties to comply with subpoena by All Plaintiffs. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9696881 - Fee: $52 dollars by All Plaintiffs. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit "G",
Att: 3 Exhibit "F"
Monday, March 04, 2024
1 1 motion Misc. Case - Initiating Motion Mon 03/04 11:27 PM
INITIATING MOTION Compel Nonparties to comply with subpoena by All Plaintiffs. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9696881 - Fee: $52 dollars (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kerry Culpepper,
Att: 2 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit Schedule "A" [Redacted list of nonparties],
Att: 4 Exhibit "A" [Redacted subpoenas and proofs of service],
Att: 5 Exhibit "B" [Order in underlying case]