Odessa's Foster Care Homes,, Inc.
Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jennie D Latta |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20985 |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Odessa's Foster Care Homes,, Inc.
694 Williams Ave
Memphis, TN 38126-5812 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee One Memphis Place 200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38103 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 12:03 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
court
Notice Of Continuance
Thu 04/25 3:00 PM
Notice Of Continuance related document(s)8 Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for 11 U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 05/09/2024 at 10:15 AM Room 645, Memphis, TN. (dch) Auto-docketed(CPA) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Wed 04/24 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
3
pgs
order
Order On Application To Employ
Mon 04/22 10:28 AM
Order Approving Application to Employ Harris Shelton Hanover Walsh, PLLC as Counsel For Debtor (ana) |
|
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Sat 04/13 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/11 2:23 PM
Status Report Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Odessa's Foster Care Homes,, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven) |
|
21 | 21
order
Agreed / Consent Order
Thu 04/11 8:54 AM
Consent Order Extending Deadline To Appoint A Patient Care Ombudsman Or Find That Appointment Of A Patient Care Ombudsman Is Not Necessary Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 333(a) (ams) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
trustee
UST Report Of Meeting Of Creditors Held
Mon 04/08 11:18 AM
The United States Trustee reports that the Meeting of Creditors required under 11 U.S.C. Section 341 has been held and conducted as scheduled. (Walker, Jamaal) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
7
pgs
motion
Employ
Fri 04/05 1:27 PM
Application to Employ Steven N. Douglass as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Odessa's Foster Care Homes,, Inc. (Douglass, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Wed 03/20 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Amended/Corrected Voluntary Petition
Wed 03/20 10:51 AM
Amended/Corrected Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition as to Tax Exempt Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Odessa's Foster Care Homes,, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven) |
|
utility
Satisfy Missing Document(s) Deadline
Wed 03/20 7:05 AM
All Completion/Missing Documents have been filed and all related deadlines have been satisfied. (ana) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Completion Documents
Tue 03/19 4:51 PM
Summary - Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B, Schedule C, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Schedule I, Schedule J, Schedule J-2 Declaration Concerning Debtor Schedules, Declaration re Corporation or Partnership, Statement Of Financial Affairs & Debtor Declaration, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Odessa's Foster Care Homes,, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
court
Notice Of Documents that Remain Missing or Incomplete
Mon 03/18 6:57 AM
Notice of Documents that Remain Missing or Incomplete: List of Equity Security Holders,Summary - Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement Of Financial Affairs & Debtor Declaration, (ana) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Disclosure Of Compensation Of Attorney For Debtor
Fri 03/15 5:20 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Odessa's Foster Care Homes,, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
trustee
UST Notice Of Initial Debtor Interview
Wed 03/13 8:41 AM
As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on **RESETTING** Monday, March 18, 2024, telephonically at 2:00 p.m. (LeSueur, Darlene) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
trustee
UST Notice Of Initial Debtor Interview
Tue 03/12 8:53 AM
As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on Thursday, March 14, 2024, telephonically at 1:00 p.m. (LeSueur, Darlene) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Fri 03/08 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/08/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Meeting Of Creditors
Fri 03/08 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/08/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Thu 03/07 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order And Notice Of Deadlines and Date Set for Status Conf (initial order on Ch 11 SubchV)
Wed 03/06 11:26 AM
Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for 11 U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 4/25/2024 at 10:15 AM Room 645, Memphis, TN . Pre Status Conference Report Due By 4/11/2024. (ana) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting Of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 03/06 8:29 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/8/2024 at 10:00 AM via by telephone or videoconference. Proof of Claims due by 6/17/2024. Government Proof of Claims due by 9/3/2024. (ana) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice (For Attorney Filers ONLY)
Tue 03/05 1:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James E. Bailey III. on behalf of James E. Bailey III. (Bailey, James) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice - GENERIC
Tue 03/05 1:16 PM
Notice of 11 U.S.C. § 341 Meeting of Creditors Telephonic Conference Filed by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Walker, Jamaal) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
trustee
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee
Tue 03/05 1:07 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . James E. Bailey, III added to the case. (Walker, Jamaal) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Affidavit | ||
3 | 3
utility
Update Chapter 11 Deficiency Deadlines
Tue 03/05 8:18 AM
Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Deficiency Deadlines Updated to Indicate Incomplete Filings: Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Incomplete Filings Due by 3/19/2024. (ana) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice (For Attorney Filers ONLY)
Tue 03/05 6:57 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Walker, Jamaal) |
|
trustee
U.S. Trustee Notice Setting Meeting Of Creditors
Tue 03/05 1:09 PM
Notice By The U.S. Trustee Setting The Meeting Of Creditors. Section 341 Meeting has been set on 4/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at telephonically. (Walker, Jamaal) |
||
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Ch 11 - Atty Case Opening Only)
Mon 03/04 4:00 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual with deficiencies,. Filing Fee Due $1738, Filed by Odessa's Foster Care Homes,, Inc. Chapter 11 SubChapter V Plan due by 06/3/2024. (Douglass, Steven) |
|
misc
Matrix
Mon 03/04 4:01 PM
Matrix Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Odessa's Foster Care Homes,, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven) |
||
crditcrd
AutoDocket Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Mon 03/04 4:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-20985 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A40966335, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |