Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00417
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Mayfield City School District Board of Education
Plaintiff
Jessica Lauro
Represented By
Michelle K. McGuire
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
5 5 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/09 4:47 PM
Order of Case Dismissal: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and the terms of the parties joint stipulation for dismissal with prejudice (Doc. No.4 ), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The case is closed.IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 7/9/2024. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
4 4 motion Dismiss Thu 05/23 2:58 PM
Stipulated Motion to dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jessica Lauro. (McGuire, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
3 3 order Initial Order Wed 03/06 9:26 AM
Initial Standing Order signed by Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 3/6/2024. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
2 2 2 pgs oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Tue 03/05 11:06 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided and was not issued. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 03/05 11:04 AM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 03/05 11:04 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]