Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Lee Ann Reno
Case #: 5:24-cv-00065
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, July 12, 2024
21 21 order Judgment Fri 07/12 11:54 AM
JUDGMENT: This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/12/2024) (jdh)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Fri 07/12 11:47 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Dismissal without prejudice under Rule 41(b) is appropriate here. Perkins's failure to respond to the Court's Order appears to reflect an intent to abandon this lawsuit rather than to create purposeful delay. Regardless, this case cannot proceed without his compliance. Perkins's Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/12/2024) (jdh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 07/12 11:55 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:20,21. Fri Jul 12 11:55:25 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
19 19 respm Response/Objection Mon 06/17 11:55 AM
RESPONSE: Questionnaire filed by Jason Perkins re:12 Judge's Questionnaire. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
misc Administrative Record Fri 05/31 1:49 PM
Authenticated Records re:9 received in Lubbock and forwarded to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno's Chambers. (jdh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Wed 05/15 10:07 AM
ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: Because Plaintiff filed this action while incarcerated, he was required to pay the full filing fee applicable to this case ($350.00) as set out in the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA). The Court finds that Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the $350.00 filing fee despite his release from confinement. Therefore, Plaintiff is ORDERED topay the $350.00 filing fee by June 15, 2024. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of the case for want of prosecution under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/15/2024) (bmh)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/15 10:03 AM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME: ORDER granting14 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff's Briefing Order questionnaire deadline is extended to June 15, 2024. As previously noted in the Briefing Order, failure to provide the questionnaire responses may cause Plaintiff's case to be dismissed for failureto prosecute. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/15/2024) (bmh)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 05/15 9:57 AM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL: The Court declines to exercise that discretion at this time because Plaintiff's case presents no exceptional circumstances to justify appointed counsel. Accordingly, the Motion15 is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/15/2024) (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 05/15 10:08 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16,17,18. Wed May 15 10:08:51 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
15 15 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 05/14 11:39 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jason Perkins. (bmh)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/14 11:38 AM
MOTION to Extend Time for Briefing Order filed by Jason Perkins. (bmh)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 05/14 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Jason Perkins. New address: 808 4th Street, Abernathy, TX 79311. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
12 12 order Judge's Questionnaire Tue 04/16 4:14 PM
BRIEFING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiff shall have until May 16, 2024, to complete the enclosed questionnaire and return it to the Clerk of the Court for filing in the record of this cause. Plaintiff is instructed to respond to each question with the relevant facts, not with legal argument or citation to cases and statutes. Plaintiff is instructed to answer each question completely and, if he does not know a precise date, to provide the approximate date. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 4/16/2024) (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/16 4:14 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Tue Apr 16 16:14:33 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
misc Administrative Record Tue 04/09 2:09 PM
Authenticated Records re:9 received and transmitted to Dallas per JGB's Chambers. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
11 11 misc Prisoner/Social Security Consent Fri 03/29 10:20 AM
Notice and election regarding consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Jason Perkins. (jdh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned (Public Entry) Tue 03/26 8:25 AM
Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Pursuant to the directives in Special Order 3-249 and the directions of Judge James Wesley Hendrix related to docket control, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. Future filings in this case should reflect the case number as 5:24-cv-00065-BR. (egp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
10 10 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry) Tue 03/19 11:31 AM
Mail returned as undeliverable.9 Order for Authenticated Records received back from Assistant City Attorney, Lubbock City Attorney's Office as RTS: Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
9 9 4 pgs order Order Mon 03/11 9:53 AM
ORDER FOR AUTHENTICATED RECORDS: It is therefore ORDERED that the entities and/or officials listed in this Order shall provide the Court with authenticated and verified copies of any and all records pertaining to the specific allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint and any amended complaint. The records and executed Certification must be returned to the Court on or before April 9, 2024. Clerk mailed a copy of this Order and Plaintiff's Complaint and any amended complaint to the above-listed addresses. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 3/11/2024) (bmh)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability or Consent Mon 03/11 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION: It is ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff must sign and date the attached consent form and return the completed form to the United States District Clerk, Northern District of Texas, Lubbock Division, within thirty (30) days from the receipt of this notice. Clerk this notice, N.D. Texas Miscellaneous Order No. 14, and the attached consent form to Plaintiff. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 3/11/2024) (bmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Miscellaneous Order 14
misc Order Receipt Mon 03/11 9:53 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Clerk mailed copy of this Order and Plaintiff's Complaint and any amended complaint to the above-listed addresses. Mon Mar 11 09:53:28 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 03/08 10:15 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING THE CASE TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge James Wesley Hendrix no longer assigned to case. This case will now be numbered Civil Action No. 5:24-CV-00065-BQ. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/8/2024) (bmh)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Directing Full Payment Fri 03/08 10:12 AM
PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis2 . Jason Perkins shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/8/2024) (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 03/08 10:16 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Fri Mar 8 10:16:36 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
5 5 order Order Tue 03/05 12:28 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER: Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2); 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(a). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process will be withheld until judicial screening is complete, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel may be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until an answer is filed or until further order, (4) no amendments or supplements may be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/5/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Tue 03/05 9:19 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bmh)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Hendrix Tue 03/05 9:19 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/05 9:17 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Jason Perkins. (bmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/05 9:16 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jason Perkins. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 03/05 9:21 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,3,4. Tue Mar 5 09:21:04 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 03/05 1:11 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Mar 5 13:11:01 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]