Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:24-cv-00293
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
Represented By
Julie M. O'Dell
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins, LLP
contact info
Robert J. Katzenstein
Smith, Katzenstein, & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Santander Holdings USA, Inc.
Represented By
Jorge M. Rojas
contact info
Brian M. Rostocki
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Courtney C.T. Horrigan
contact info
Timothy P. Law
contact info
Anne M. Steadman
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, November 14, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/14 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Santander Holdings USA, Inc. as to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) with prejudice (Rostocki, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Civil Thu 11/14 1:03 PM
CASE CLOSED per entry of D.I.17 . (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
16 16 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 10/31 11:51 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order Setting Deadline for Dismissal - filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Katzenstein, Robert) Modified on 10/31/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 10/31 12:02 PM
SO ORDERED, re16 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Setting Deadline for Dismissal to be submitted by 11/22/2024. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/31/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Thu 09/05 4:51 PM
SO ORDERED Granting14 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Deadline for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/5/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Thu 09/05 2:29 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Deadline for Dismissal, by Federal Insurance Company. (Katzenstein, Robert) Modified on 9/5/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 08/07 2:15 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Federal Insurance Company. (O'Dell, Julie) Modified on 8/7/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 08/07 2:21 PM
SO ORDERED, re13 Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Federal Insurance Company answer due 9/5/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 08/07 4:40 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jorge M. Rojas for Santander Holdings USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mws)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
12 12 misc Proposed Order Mon 07/01 12:16 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, by Federal Insurance Company. (O'Dell, Julie) Modified on 7/1/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 07/01 12:30 PM
SO ORDERED, re12 Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Federal Insurance Company answer due 8/12/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/31 3:43 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Katzenstein, Robert) Modified on 5/31/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 05/31 3:53 PM
SO ORDERED, re11 Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Federal Insurance Company answer due 7/12/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/31/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
10 10 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 05/08 3:12 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Katzenstein, Robert) Modified on 5/8/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 05/08 4:44 PM
SO ORDERED, re10 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Federal Insurance Company answer due 6/13/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 day ddl Wed 04/10 2:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc.: For Federal Insurance Company waiver sent on 3/15/2024, answer due 5/14/2024. (Rostocki, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 03/15 11:16 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Courtney C.T. Horrigan and Timothy P. Law for Santander Holdings USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/13 12:14 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Wed 03/13 1:55 PM
SO ORDERED, re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy P. Law, filed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc.,6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jorge M. Rojas, filed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc., and5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Courtney C.T. Horrigan, filed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
8 8 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Wed 03/06 4:14 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Timothy P. Law, Jorge M. Rojas, and Courtney C.T. Horrigan. ( re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy P. Law,6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jorge M. Rojas,5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Courtney C.T. Horrigan )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4355348).(Rostocki, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/06 4:10 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy P. Law - filed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc..(Rostocki, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification by Counsel
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/06 4:07 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jorge M. Rojas - filed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc..(Rostocki, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification by Counsel
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/06 4:03 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Courtney C.T. Horrigan - filed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc..(Rostocki, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification by Counsel
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 03/05 12:47 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Banco Santander, S.A. for Santander Holdings USA, Inc. filed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc.. (Rostocki, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued - Electronic Service Tue 03/05 12:26 PM
Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mrr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 03/05 12:21 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mrr)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/05 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Federal Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4353635.) - filed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed Tue 03/05 12:24 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (mrr)
Related: [-]