New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 1:14-bk-13200
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2014
Terminated:Jul 17, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Jun 12, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Aereo, Inc.
280 Summer St Fl 4
Boston, MA 02210-1131
Represented By
William R. Baldiga
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Robert Benjamin Chapman
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk LLC, Claims Agent
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
David Michael Smith
Griffin Hamersky LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Robert T Kugler
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Edwin H. Caldie
Leonard, Street And Deinard
contact info
Trustee
Lawton W. Bloom, Liquidation Trustee
Represented By
Robert Benjamin Chapman
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
Represented By
Susan D. Golden
Office Of United States Trustee Sdny
contact info
Andrew D. Velez-Rivera
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Aereo bankruptcy plan approved (intellectualpropertymagazine.com)
Submitted Wed 06/10/2015
2. Aereo Settles with Broadcasters for $950,000 (worldscreen.com)
Submitted Thu 04/23/2015
3. TiVo Gets Bankruptcy Court Nod to Acquire Some Aereo Assets (zacks.com)
Submitted Tue 03/17/2015
4. Judge approves Aereo bankruptcy sale to TiVo, others - Boston Business Journal (bizjournals.com)
Submitted Thu 03/12/2015
5. Aereo assets go up for sale » Digital TV Europe (digitaltveurope.net)
Submitted Wed 02/25/2015
6. Bankruptcy Court Says Aereo Can Sell Its Assets - TVSpy (mediabistro.com)
Submitted Mon 12/29/2014
7. Aereo Allowed to Auction Web TV Technology (wsj.com)
Submitted Sat 12/27/2014
8. Broadcasters Pursue Aereo in Bankruptcy Tug-of-War (litigationdaily.com)
Submitted Thu 12/18/2014
9. American University Intellectual Property Brief » Aereo Files For Bankruptcy Following 3-year Copyright Fight (ipbrief.net)
Submitted Sun 11/30/2014
10. Aereo files for bankruptcy (reuters.com)
Submitted Fri 11/21/2014
Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Monday, August 07, 2017
426 426 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 08/07 12:04 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by William R. Baldiga on behalf of Lawton W. Bloom, Liquidation Trustee. (Baldiga, William)
Related: [-] 425
Friday, August 04, 2017
425 425 misc Post-Confirmation Report Fri 08/04 4:17 PM
Post-Confirmation Report. Monthly Operating Report for the Period 6/15/17 to 7/31/17 Filed by William R. Baldiga on behalf of Lawton W. Bloom, Liquidation Trustee. (Baldiga, William)
Related: [-]