California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Case #: 5:24-cv-01321
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 2:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Silicon Valley Bank
Represented By
Casey D. Laffey
Reed Smtih LLP
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith
contact info
Elliott McGraw
Bailey & Glasser
contact info
Derek J Baker
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Lawrence Heftman
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Leslie Agnes Brueckner, Ms.
Bailey & Glasser
contact info
Emily Frances Lynch
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
David Christopher Giles
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Stephen Sorensen
Bailey Glasser
contact info
Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Silicon Valley Bridge Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Casey D. Laffey
Reed Smtih LLP
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith
contact info
Derek J Baker
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Frances Lynch
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, in its Corporate Capacity
Represented By
Emily Casey Warren Kapur
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Plaintiff
SVB Financial Group
Represented By
Diane Lee McGimsey
Sullivan And Cromwell LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Sacks
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Adam Seth Paris
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 26 2024
ORDER GRANTING 65 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTY'S MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/26/2024. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2024)
GPO Oct 06 2024
ORDER re 68 81 August 23, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Plaintiff's Privilege Review. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2024)
GPO Oct 17 2024
AMENDED ORDER re 82 95 August 23, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Plaintiff's Privilege Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/17/2024. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2024)
GPO Nov 29 2024
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 33 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on November 29, 2024. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2024)
GPO Dec 02 2024
ORDER re 107 November 20, 2024 Discovery Dispute re Proposed ESI Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/2/2024. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2024)
GPO Feb 21 2025
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES (RE: ECF 141). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/21/2025. (blflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2025) (Entered: 2/21/2025)
GPO May 02 2025
ORDER DENYING 178 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/2/2025. (blflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2025) (Entered: 5/2/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
201 201 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/08 2:25 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 1, 2025 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (jcf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
200 200 misc Transcript Tue 05/06 1:37 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/01/2025, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 5/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025. (Fisher, Summer)
Related: [-] 191 Transcript Order (s)191
Monday, May 05, 2025
199 199 misc Transcript Order Mon 05/05 2:03 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 1, 2025 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (jcf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
198 198 9 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 05/05 9:40 AM
ORDER granting 196 Joint Stipulation re Deposition Limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/5/2025. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
197 197 misc Transcript Sat 05/03 2:45 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/30/25, before Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: 10:02 - 10:30 11:33 - 11:42. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 5/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2025. (Jauregui, Tara)
Related: [-] (188 in 5:24-cv-01321-BLF) Transcript Order,
Friday, May 02, 2025
196 196 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 05/02 6:09 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re114 Order Joint Stipulation Re Deposition Limits filed by SVB Financial Trust. (Allen, Julia)
Related: [-]
195 195 misc Transcript Order Fri 05/02 10:34 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/1/2025 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, in its Corporate Capacity, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Cooper, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
194 194 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 05/02 9:53 AM
ORDER DENYING 178 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/2/2025. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
193 193 misc Transcript Order Fri 05/02 4:16 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 1, 2025 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Silicon Valley Bank, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Silicon Valley Bridge Bank, N.A., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Heftman, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
192 192 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 05/01 5:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2025 re 160 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses filed by SVB Financial Trust. Oral Argument Heard on Motion. Matters taken under submission - Court to issue written order. Total Time in Court: 1:26. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Van Nest, Elliot Moskowitz, Jason George, Julia Allen. Defendant Attorney: Lawrence Heftman, Kurt Gwynne, David Giles. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2025)
Related: [-]
191 191 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/01 3:45 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/01/2025 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by SVB Financial Trust, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Allen, Julia)
Related: [-]
190 190 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/01 3:07 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 30, 2025 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Silicon Valley Bank, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Silicon Valley Bridge Bank, N.A., for Recorded Proceeding - San Jose. (Heftman, Lawrence). Transcriber - Tara Jauregui, email: echoreporting@yahoo.com . Modified on 5/1/2025 (jcf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]