Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:24-cv-00102
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Case in other court:Allen County Superior Court, 02D02-2402-CT-000119
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
EACS Board of Trustees
Represented By
Jason T Clagg
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mark D Scudder
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Zachary L Barron
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Defendant
Janet Good
Represented By
Jason T Clagg
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mark D Scudder
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Zachary L Barron
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Defendant
Marilyn Hissong
Represented By
Jason T Clagg
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mark D Scudder
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Zachary L Barron
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Defendant
Michael Larocco
Defendant
Pat McCain
Represented By
Jason T Clagg
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mark D Scudder
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Zachary L Barron
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Defendant
Patty Prosser
Represented By
Jason T Clagg
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mark D Scudder
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Zachary L Barron
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Defendant
Charles Ward
Represented By
Jason T Clagg
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mark D Scudder
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Zachary L Barron
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Defendant
EACS Association Union
Mediator
Kevin Fitzharris
Plaintiff
Raymond Mack
3223 Maxim Drive
Fort Wayne, IN 46815
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
East Allen County Schools
Terminated: 03/08/2024
Represented By
Jason T Clagg
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mark D Scudder
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Zachary L Barron
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Defendant
Mark Smith
Terminated: 03/08/2024
Represented By
Jason T Clagg
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mark D Scudder
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Zachary L Barron
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
71 71 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/15 1:55 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The70 Motion to Withdraw Appearance is granted. The appearance of Attorney Stephanie M Davis is hereby withdrawn on behalf of Dft Michael LaRocco. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
70 70 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/14 2:43 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Stephanie M. Davis by Defendant Michael Larocco. (Davis, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
69 69 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/14 2:05 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The68 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Stephanie M. Davis is denied without prejudice, for lack of withdrawing attorney's signature or explanation as to why the withdrawing signature is unavailable to sign. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
68 68 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/11 1:28 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Stephanie M. Davis by Defendant Michael Larocco. (Zurschmiede, Jacob)
Related: [-]
67 67 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob P Zurschmiede on behalf of Michael Larocco (Zurschmiede, Jacob)
Related: [-]