Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Aileen Goldman Durrett
Case #: 4:24-cv-00202
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Terminated:Jun 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:17 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Sofie S. Johnson
Represented By
Mark Steven Humphreys
Mark S. Humphreys, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Lumico Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Sara Elizabeth Inman
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sofie S. Johnson
Represented By
Mark Steven Humphreys
Mark S. Humphreys, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lumico Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Sara Elizabeth Inman
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, June 13, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/13 6:00 PM
NOTICE: Stipulation of Dismissal: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and following the submission of (Dkt. #11), this civil case is dismissed with prejudice. The clerk will close and terminate this matter. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/11 12:48 PM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Lumico Life Insurance Company. (Inman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/12 8:01 AM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that, on or before Monday, June 10, 2024, Plaintiff and Defendant shall submit to the court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of the court. It is further ORDERED that all deadlines are abated to allow the parties an opportunity to file a Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 4/11/2024. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
9 9 2 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Wed 04/10 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Lumico Life Insurance Company (Inman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/02 12:53 PM
REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS this case to U. S. Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/2/2024. (RPC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
7 7 11 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Thu 03/28 5:03 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/2/2024. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/29/2024 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/28/2024. (RPC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
6 6 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 03/27 5:35 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Sofie S. Johnson (Humphreys, Mark)
Related: [-]
5 5 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 03/27 1:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Lumico Life Insurance Company by Sofie S. Johnson.(Humphreys, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 03/05 4:50 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Sofie S. Johnson. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/05 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Request for Issuance of Summons by Lumico Life Insurance Company (Inman, Sara)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 03/05 4:29 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Lumico Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Swiss Reinsurance Ltd for Lumico Life Insurance Company. (Inman, Sara)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/05 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Sofie S Johnson ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10014765.), filed by Lumico Life Insurance Company.(Inman, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 51 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 4 8 pgs Exhibit C
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/05 4:44 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Tue 03/05 4:45 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, )
Related: [-]