Heritage Senior Holdings LLC
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffery A Deller |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20544 |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Heritage Senior Holdings LLC
4220 Saw Mill Run Blvd
Pittsburgh, PA 15227-2612 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 6:06 PM EDT |
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 04/08 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 04/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 04/08 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 04/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Approval
Fri 04/05 9:11 AM
Default Order Granting Application for Approval to Allow Debtor to Use Existing Bank Account. Signed on 4/5/2024. (msch) |
|
28 | 28
order
Employ
Fri 04/05 9:07 AM
Default Order Granting Application to Employ Christopher M. Frye, Esquire and Steidl and Steinberg, P.C. as Attorney for Debtor. Signed on 4/5/2024. (msch) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of No Objection
Tue 04/02 12:23 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application to Employ Counsel for the Debtor Regarding the Hearing on 4/9/2024. Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC . (Frye, Christopher) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Certificate of No Objection
Tue 04/02 12:19 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion to Allow Debtor to Use Existing Bank Regarding the Hearing on 4/9/2024. Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC . (Frye, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/02 11:08 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joseph James Perotti Jr Filed by Creditor County Of Allegheny (Perotti, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 03/27 11:46 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Maribeth Thomas Filed by Creditor Brentwood Borough (Thomas, Maribeth) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 03/27 11:40 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Maribeth Thomas Filed by Creditor Brentwood Borough School District (Thomas, Maribeth) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 03/23 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 03/22/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
trustee
341 by Telephone
Wed 03/20 4:58 PM
The upcoming 341(a) meeting is scheduled to be held by phone. Call 1-877-612-9054 and use access code 4831906 to join the meeting. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. (Rofael, Elvina) |
|
20 | 20
order
With Notice
Wed 03/20 3:52 PM
Order With Notice That the Debtor Shall Within 30 Days of Bar Date Serve a Completed Notice and File a Certificate of Service Within 14 Days. cm: Christopher M. Frye, Esq. Signed on 3/20/2024. (culy) |
|
19 | 19
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Business/Corporation
Wed 03/20 3:41 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/19/2024 at 01:00 PM Ch 11 341 telephonic hearing. Proofs of Claims due by 7/18/2024. (culy) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 03/20 2:22 PM
Proposed Order RE: Motion to Allow Debtor to Use Existing Bank Account Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC . (Frye, Christopher) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Tax Information
Mon 03/18 5:11 PM
Tax Information for the Year for N/A - Affidavit Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC (Frye, Christopher) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Petition Completed
Mon 03/18 5:09 PM
Petition Completed Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC (Frye, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Supplement/Addendum
Thu 03/14 1:26 PM
Supplement/Addendum to Application to Employ Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC . (Frye, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 03/14 9:12 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by William M. Buchanan Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Buchanan, William) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Tue 03/12 4:34 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing . (culy) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7
Tue 03/12 11:00 AM
Amended Certificate of Service of Notice of Hybrid Hearing with Response Deadline, with a copy of the Motion to Allow Debtor to Use Existing Bank Account Regarding the Hearing on 4/9/2024. Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC . (Frye, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Mailing Matrix | ||
11 | 11
misc
Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee
Tue 03/12 10:57 AM
Hearing on Motion to Allow Debtor to Use Existing Bank Account Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC . Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2024 at 10:00 AM via p04 Courtroom D, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 3/29/2024. (Frye, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - Mailing Matrix | ||
10 | 10
motion
Approval
Tue 03/12 10:55 AM
Application for Approval for Debtor to Use Existing Bank Account Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC. (Frye, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee
Thu 03/07 4:33 PM
Hearing on Application to Employ Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC . Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2024 at 10:00 AM via p04 Courtroom D, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 3/25/2024. (Frye, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - Mailing Matrix | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
motion
Employ
Thu 03/07 4:31 PM
Application to Employ Christopher M. Frye and Steidl and Steinberg, P.C. as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC. (Frye, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Verified Statement | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 03/06 10:58 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Marta Elena Villacorta Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Villacorta, Marta) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 03/06 10:55 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Elvina Rofael Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Rofael, Elvina) |
|
5 | 5
court
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies
Wed 03/06 8:41 AM
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies. Assigned Judge: DELLER. Pursuant to Local Rule 1017-2, the United States Trustee is deemed to have filed a Motion To Dismiss this case, and that Motion will be deemed GRANTED, if any deadline set forth in the first docket entry or any of the following deadlines is not met. Incomplete Filings: SCHEDULES D, G AND H AND THE LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS ARE DUE 3/19/2024. . (culy) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines
Wed 03/06 8:39 AM
Deadlines Updated . List of Equity Security Holders due 3/19/2024. Schedule D due 3/19/2024. Schedule G due 3/19/2024. Schedule H due 3/19/2024. / The Employee Income Records deadline was terminated as inapplicable to a non-individual case. (culy) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Tue 03/05 4:30 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-20544 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16657367, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29
Tue 03/05 1:13 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Heritage Senior Holdings LLC (Frye, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
Tue 03/05 1:12 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Heritage Senior Holdings LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 08/31/2024. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 03/19/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/3/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/3/2024. Atty Disclosure Statement due 03/19/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 03/19/2024. Employee Income Record or a statement that there is no record due by 03/19/2024. Schedule A/B due 03/19/2024. Schedule E/F due 03/19/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/19/2024. Summary of schedules due 03/19/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 03/19/2024. (Frye, Christopher) |