Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Mark S Norris
Referred: Tu M Pham
Case #: 2:24-cv-02143
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Blues City Brewery, LLC
Represented By
J. Gregory Grisham
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Jeff Weintraub
Fisher And Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Caiman Holdco, LLC
Represented By
J. Gregory Grisham
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Jeff Weintraub
Fisher And Phillips, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kendra Lee
Represented By
Ralph T. Gibson
Ggp Law PC
contact info
Alexandria Scott
Gibson Perryman Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
64 64 3 pgs motion Leave to File Document Tue 04/22 4:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Kendra Lee.(Scott, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A-Third Amended Complaint
Thursday, April 17, 2025
63 63 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/17 2:58 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kendra Lee. (Scott, Alexandria)
Related: [-]