GLORIA LASER CLINIC INC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Deborah J Saltzman |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-11686 |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Debtor
GLORIA LASER CLINIC INC
4733 Elmwood Ave Apt 405
Los Angeles, CA 90004-3158 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
John P Pringle (TR)
Roquemore, Pringle & Moore, Inc. 13300 Crossroads Parkway North Suite 185
City of Industry, CA 91746 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 03/06/2024 12:18 AM PST |
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 03/05 3:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-11686] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56572943. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 03/05 2:58 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by GLORIA LASER CLINIC INC (Coe, Jaenam) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Tue 03/05 3:04 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/3/2024 at 08:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |