Katrina Spears Babcock, D.O. Corporation
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Ronald A Clifford III |
Case #: | 9:24-bk-10241 |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Debtor
Katrina Spears Babcock, D.O. Corporation
325 Rolling Oaks Dr Ste 220
Thousand Oaks, CA 91361-1085 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Jeremy W. Faith (TR)
16030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 470
Encino, CA 91436 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 03/06/2024 12:19 AM PST |
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 03/05 2:27 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:9:24-bk-10241] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56572533. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 03/05 2:24 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Katrina Spears Babcock, D.O. Corporation Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 04/4/2024 (Higson, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Tue 03/05 2:30 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Katrina Spears Babcock, D.O. Corporation. (Higson, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Tue 03/05 2:35 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/11/2024 at 09:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Tue 03/05 3:12 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect case data/statistical information was entered at the time of filing. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (ES9) |