Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Keith A Pesto
Case #: 3:24-cv-00049
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Re-opened:Mar 20, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2024
Petitioner
DOUGLAS BROWN
Respondent
DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY
Respondent
MELISSA HAINSWORTH
Respondent
PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL

GPO Aug 22 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying as premature 8 Motion to Compel Respondent to Comply with Court Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 8/22/2024. Copy of order and form petition mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
GPO Dec 17 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER directing counsel for the respondent to obtain by affidavits from employees of the Clerk of Beaver County and of the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, and from any other necessary person, information relevant to the answers to the questions contained herein. The affidavits shall be filed in a supplemental response on or before 1/31/2025. Further proceedings will be scheduled by subsequent order if necessary. In the meantime, counsel for the respondent shall follow through to ensure that the Clerk of Beaver County sends the original transcripts to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 12/17/2024. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
24 24 motion Clarification Fri 01/31 11:53 AM
MOTION for Clarification as to22 Order,,, Set Deadlines,,, Set Response,,, Response/Briefing Schedule,, by MELISSA HAINSWORTH, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Hronek, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Beaver County Clerk of Courts,
Att: 2 Affidavit Department of Corrections
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Fri 01/31 1:06 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re24 Motion for Clarification,. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
23 23 misc Affidavit Thu 01/16 2:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT re21 Response to Habeas Petition,, by MELISSA HAINSWORTH, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Hronek, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
misc State Court Records Thu 12/19 2:26 PM
STATE COURT RECORDS received from Court of Common Pleas of Beaver County and forwarded to Mag. Judge Pesto. Case Number(s): CP-04-CR-382-2020.. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Response Order Response/Briefing Schedule Tue 12/17 3:50 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER directing counsel for the respondent to obtain by affidavits from employees of the Clerk of Beaver County and of the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, and from any other necessary person, information relevant to the answers to the questions contained herein. The affidavits shall be filed in a supplemental response on or before 1/31/2025. Further proceedings will be scheduled by subsequent order if necessary. In the meantime, counsel for the respondent shall follow through to ensure that the Clerk of Beaver County sends the original transcripts to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 12/17/2024. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Tue 12/17 2:44 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re21 Response to Habeas Petition,,. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information - ATTORNEY ADDRESS, PHONE NUMBER AND EMAIL. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
21 21 respoth Response to Habeas Petition Mon 12/16 5:09 PM
Commonwealth's RESPONSE to4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MELISSA HAINSWORTH, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Hronek, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 26, 2024
20 20 misc Supplement Thu 09/26 4:54 PM
Letter Objection to Order of Court September 18, 2024 . (ert) Modified text on 9/26/2024. (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Subst of Atty (Use to subst attys w/in the same firm) Tue 09/24 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Alicia Hronek on behalf of DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY. Attorney Richard E. Absey terminated. (Hronek, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Wed 09/18 2:46 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY. (Absey, Richard)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/18 12:31 PM
ORDER OF COURT terminating11 Motion to Compel Respondent to Comply with Court Order; granting12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; terminating14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Commonwealth shall file its Answer on or before 12/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 9/18/2024. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 09/17 12:21 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY. (Absey, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Oder for Extension of Time
misc QC - No Proposed Order Attached Tue 09/17 11:51 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ERROR: Proposed Order, which is required for all motions in civil cases per Local Rule LCvR7, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (jd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 09/16 4:21 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY. (Absey, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
16 16 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Tue 09/17 3:46 PM
AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DOUGLAS BROWN. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
13 13 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 09/10 12:21 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DOUGLAS BROWN. (jd)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/10 12:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DOUGLAS BROWN. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, August 22, 2024
11 11 motion Compel Fri 08/23 1:39 PM
MOTION to Compel Respondent to Comply with Court Order by DOUGLAS BROWN. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Envelope
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Compel Thu 08/22 11:58 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying without prejudice7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying as premature8 Motion to Compel Respondent to Comply with Court Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 8/22/2024. Copy of order and form petition mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
10 10 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Thu 08/22 1:05 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by DOUGLAS BROWN. DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY served on 8/5/2024, answer due 8/26/2024; MELISSA HAINSWORTH served on 8/5/2024, answer due 8/26/2024; PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 8/5/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
8 8 motion Compel Fri 08/16 9:34 AM
MOTION to Compel Respondant to Comply with Court Order by DOUGLAS BROWN. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, July 25, 2024
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 07/25 2:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as to service by DOUGLAS BROWN. (cel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 07/16 10:53 AM
RULE and ORDER directing the Marshal to make service of the petition and this Order on the respondent (the Warden), the Pennsylvania Attorney General, and the District Attorney for Beaver County, costs to be advanced by the petitioner. Within twenty days of service, respondent, through the District Attorney for Beaver County, shall file a response to the allegations in the petition for the writ of habeas corpus, showing cause, if any, why the writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 7/16/2024. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
5 5 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Tue 03/26 3:40 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DOUGLAS BROWN. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
4 4 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 03/20 12:36 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00, receipt number 200008378), filed by DOUGLAS BROWN. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Bernard Carter Jerry-El
3 3 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 03/20 12:19 PM
Habeas Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 200008378 (jd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order for Administrative Case Closing Mon 03/11 11:39 AM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING: The Clerk will mark this matter administratively closed (that is not a dismissal of this action) until petitioner pays the filing fee or submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 3/11/2024. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
1 1 utility Remark for lodged habeas petition Fri 03/08 4:34 PM
Remark: Habeas Petition lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (elt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Envelope