Maryland District Court
Judge:Richard D Bennett
Case #: 1:24-cv-00670
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Terminated:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Kalyana Chakravarti Surapu
Represented By
Robert P Floyd, III
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Robert P Floyd, III
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Oscar Rolando Gonzales Gutierrez
Represented By
Omar Vincent Melehy
Melehy And Associates LLC
contact info
Suvita Melehy
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Claudia Verali Pineda Morel
Represented By
Omar Vincent Melehy
Melehy And Associates LLC
contact info
Suvita Melehy
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Carlos Linares Torres
Represented By
Omar Vincent Melehy
Melehy And Associates LLC
contact info
Suvita Melehy
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Monday, November 04, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/04 11:01 AM
MARGINAL ORDER Approving20 Joing Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Oscar Rolando Gonzales Gutierrez, Claudia Verali Pineda Morel, Juan Carlos Linares Torres. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/4/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/04 10:59 AM
ORDER Granting21 Joint Motion For The Court To Retain Jurisdiction To EnforceSettlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/4/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/01 12:27 PM
Joint MOTION for the Court to Retain Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Oscar Rolando Gonzales Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Linares Torres, Claudia Verali Pineda Morel(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/01 12:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Oscar Rolando Gonzales Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Linares Torres, Claudia Verali Pineda Morel(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment Fri 11/01 9:13 AM
ORDER Granting18 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/31/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
18 18 13 pgs motion Judgment Fri 10/04 9:53 AM
Joint MOTION for Judgment for Judicial Approval of FLSA Settlement by Oscar Rolando Gonzales Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Linares Torres, Claudia Verali Pineda Morel(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Monday, September 16, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 09/17 9:17 AM
Settlement Conference held on 9/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (rm2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/30 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Suvita Melehy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Mon 07/29 9:35 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 7/29/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 07/23 3:09 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey for ADR Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/23/2024. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/23 1:04 PM
ORDER granting13 Parties' Joint Request to Modify Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/23/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 07/22 5:03 PM
Joint MOTION Modify Initial Scheduling Order re12 Scheduling Order and Joint report of the Parties by Oscar Rolando Gonzales Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Linares Torres, Claudia Verali Pineda Morel(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/08 2:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/20/2024. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/8/2024.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Informal Discovery Letter
11 11 9 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 07/08 1:25 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by Kalyana Chakravarti Surapu, Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company.(Floyd, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/07 3:55 PM
ORDER Granting9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Amended Complaint Kalyana Chakravarti Surapu answer due 7/8/2024; Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company answer due 7/8/2024.. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/7/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 06/07 2:40 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Amended Complaint by Kalyana Chakravarti Surapu, Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company(Floyd, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 24, 2024
8 8 11 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/24 6:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Oscar Rolando Gonzales Gutierrez, Claudia Verali Pineda Morel, Juan Carlos Linares Torres.(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Amended Complaint (Tracked Changes)
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/24 1:38 PM
ORDER granting6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint ,1 Complaint Kalyana Chakravarti Surapu answer due 5/24/2024; Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company answer due 5/24/2024.. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/24/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/24 11:29 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Kalyana Chakravarti Surapu, Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company(Floyd, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/04 8:23 AM
ORDER Granting4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Kalyana Chakravarti Surapu answer due 4/24/2024; Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company answer due 4/24/2024.. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/3/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/03 3:41 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Kalyana Chakravarti Surapu, Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company(Floyd, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
3 3 2 pgs misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 04/03 3:39 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company (Floyd, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/07 9:00 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Kalyana Chakravarti Surapu, Triveni Supermarket MD Limited Liability Company.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/06 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11127878.), filed by Oscar Rolando Gonzales Gutierrez.(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons