Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10964

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James L Garrity Jr
Case #: 1:24-ap-01325
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Department of Education
Represented By
United States Department of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Janny White Lion
200 West 26th Street 913
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
Janny White Lion
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
12 12 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 10/09 1:44 PM
Stipulation and Order signed on 10/9/2024 re: Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 11
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/09 1:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1325 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Proposed Order Tue 10/08 1:17 PM
Notice of Proposed Order (Stipulation and Order of Dismissal) (Farber, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Memorandum Endorsed Order Mon 08/19 11:49 AM
Memorandum Endorsed Order signed on 8/15/2024 Re: Request for Extension and Adjournment. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Tue 07/30 1:26 PM
Letter requesting extension of deadline to respond to the complaint and adjournment of pre-trial conference Filed by David E. Farber on behalf of United States Department of Education. (Farber, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Memorandum Endorsed Order Mon 06/10 11:41 AM
Memorandum Endorsed Order signed on 6/7/2024 Re: Request for Extension. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Wed 05/29 6:00 PM
Letter requesting extension of deadline to respond to the complaint and adjournment of pre-trial conference Filed by David E. Farber on behalf of United States Department of Education. (Farber, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Memorandum Endorsed Order Thu 04/11 11:47 AM
Memorandum Endorsed Order signed on 4/11/2024 Re: Request for Extension. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, April 04, 2024
5 5 misc Letter Thu 04/04 3:55 PM
Letter requesting extension of deadline to respond to the complaint and adjournment of pre-trial conference (corrected) Filed by David E. Farber on behalf of United States Department of Education. (Farber, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 04/04 2:13 PM
Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Adjourn Pre-Trial Conference filed by David E. Farber on behalf of United States Department of Education. (Farber, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/03 6:54 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by David E. Farber on behalf of United States Department of Education. (Farber, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 03/05 2:57 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (JLG), Answer due by 4/4/2024, (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 03/05 2:56 PM
Adversary case 24-01325 Complaint against United States Department of Education (Fee Amount $ 350.) Related [+]. Nature(s) of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) Filed by Janny White Lion. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-] ceipt Number 623.
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet