Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Denise J Casper
Case #: 1:24-cv-10565
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
Represented By
Brian William Anderson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
John Bromley Lucy, Jr
Choate, Hall & Stewart
contact info
Michael H. Bunis
Choate, Hall & Stewart
contact info
Daniel Nowicki
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
John Zippel
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Caeli Higney
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Stephen Weissman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Steve B. Pet
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Nancy Ding
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Brian William Anderson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
John Bromley Lucy, Jr
Choate, Hall & Stewart
contact info
Michael H. Bunis
Choate, Hall & Stewart
contact info
Daniel Nowicki
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
John Zippel
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Caeli Higney
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Stephen Weissman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Steve B. Pet
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Nancy Ding
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Massachusetts Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By
Lori Ann Fanning
Miller Law LLC
contact info
Leslie R. Stern
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Kathleen Ellen Boychuck
Miller Law LLC
contact info
Matthew D. Pearson
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Carl Nils Hammarskjold
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Marvin Alan Miller
Miller Law LLC
contact info
Kristie A. LaSalle
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Steven Lev Groopman
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Andrew Szot, I
Miller Law LLC
contact info
Brooke E. Lowell
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Matthew E. Van Tine
Miller Law LLC
contact info
Gregory S. Asciolla
Dicello Levitt LLC
contact info
Todd A Seaver
Berman Tabacco
contact info

GPO Mar 27 2025
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court ALLOWS in part and DENIES in part Boehringer's motion to dismiss, D. 65, as follows:1. The motion to dismiss is ALLOWED with respect to Massachusetts Laborers' sham litigation claims.2. The motion to dismiss is ALLOWED with respect to Massachusetts Laborers' antitrust claims (monopolization and attempted monopolization) raised under Illinois, Massachusetts, Mississippi and Utah laws.3. The motion to dismiss is ALLOWED with respect to Massachusetts Laborers' consumer protection claims raised under Arkansas, Illinois, Maryland, Utah, Oklahoma, Massachusetts and Wyoming laws.4. The motion to dismiss is ALLOWED with respect to Massachusetts Laborers' unjust enrichment claims raised under the laws of Alabama, Florida, Michigan, North Dakota and Ohio. 5. The motion to dismiss is DENIED in all other respects. The remaining claims are as follow:a. Counts 1, 2, 4, 8, 9 and 11 excluding claims raised under Illinois, Massachusetts, Mississippi and Utah laws.b. Counts 5, 6, 12 and 13 excluding claims raised under Arkansas, Illinois, Maryland, Utah, Oklahoma, Massachusetts and Wyoming laws. c. Counts 15, the claim for injunctive relief under § 16 of the Clayton Act. d. Count 16 excluding claims raised under Alabama, Florida, Michigan, North Dakota and Ohio laws. (SEC)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
121 121 notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Thu 05/15 4:55 PM
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at[LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm] (DRK)
Related: [-]
120 120 misc Transcript Thu 05/15 4:54 PM
Transcript of Scheduling Conference by Video held on April 28, 2025, before Judge Denise J. Casper. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz47@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 6/5/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2025. (DRK)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
119 119 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 3:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brandon Baum-Zepeda Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-11001143 by Massachusetts Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund.(Groopman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certification