California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:24-bk-10559
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TTW Transport, Inc.
210 E Lambert Rd
Fullerton, CA 92835-1005
Represented By
Thomas J Polis
Polis & Associates, Aplc
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
142 142 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/08 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 140 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
141 141 notice Notice Thu 05/08 7:20 PM
Notice of Order Continuing Hearing on Objection to Claim [Dkt 134] to 2:30 pm Calendar Filed by Creditor Wan Hai Lines, Ltd. Related [+]. (Tong, David)
Related: [-] 134 Objection to Claim #10 by Claimant Burkhalter Kessler Clement & George LLP. in the amount of $ 24456.92 Filed by Creditor Wan Hai Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email # 2 Exhibit Burkhalter webpage # 3 Exhibit Burkhalter Proof of Claim # 4 Exhibit Order re claim bar date # 5 Exhibit Notice of Bar Date # 6 Exhibit Transcript of Examination)
Monday, May 05, 2025
140 140 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Mon 05/05 6:01 PM
Order Continuing Hearings On Objections To Claims (Dockets124 ,134 To 2:30 P.M. Calendar. IT IS ORDERED: The Court Hereby CONTINUES The Following Hearings From 1:30 P.M. On June 4, 2025, TO ITS 2:30 P.M. CALENDAR ON JUNE 4, 2025. (1) Creditor Wan Hai Lines, Ltd.'s Objection To The Proof Of Claim Of Burkhalter, Kessler, Clement & George, LLP (Claim No. 10-2) (Docket134 ) And, (2) Debtor's Objection To The Allowance Of Claims Of Ocean Network Express (Claim No. 1, Evergreen Shipping Agency America Corp (Claim No. 2), CMA CGM (America) LLC (Claim No. 3), Metro Group Maritime (Claim No. 4), Direct Chassis Link, Inc. (Claim No. 7) And Wan Hai Lines Ltd. (Claim No. 8) (Docket124 ). The Moving Parties Are To Provide Notice Of The Continuance And File A Proof Of Service By No Later Than May 8, 2025. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 5/5/2025 (NB8)
Related: [-]
139 139 notice Notice Mon 05/05 2:10 PM
Notice Debtor/Debtor-In-Possessions Notice Of Continued Hearing And New Briefing Deadlines; with proof of service Filed by Debtor TTW Transport, Inc. Related [+]. (Polis, Thomas)
Related: [-] 137 ORDER Granting Debtor/Debtor-In-Possession TTW Transports Ex Parte Motion To Continue Debtor's Chapter 11 Confirmation Hearing Pursuant To Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-1(m) And Continuing Status Conference. IT IS ORDERED: The Debtor's MOTION TO CONTINUE CHAPTER 11 CONFIRMATION HEARING Presently Scheduled For May 21, 2025 Shall Be CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 3, 2025 AT 1:30 P.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: That The New Briefing Deadlines Are As Follows: 1. JUNE 13, 2025: Last Day For Debtor To File And Serve An Amended Plan, Addressing The Filed Objections (Dockets131 And132 ). 2. JULY 11, 2025: Last Day For Creditors With Allowed Claims To Submit Ballots Accepting Or Rejecting Confirmation. 3. JULY 31, 2025: Last Day For Creditors With Allowed Claims To File Objections To Confirmation. 4. AUGUST 8, 2025: Last Day For Administrative Creditors To File Administrative Claim Fee Applications. 5. AUGUST 22, 2025: Last Day For Debtor To File Confirmation Brief, Including Any Reply To Objections To Confirmation And A Status Report. 6. SEPTEMBER 3, 2025 AT 1:30 P.M.: STATUS CONFERENCE and Hearing RE: CONFIRMATION OF DEBTOR'S CHAPTER 11 PLAN. IT IS FURTHER SO ORDERED: Debtor's Counsel Shall Give Written Notice Of This Order And File A Proof Of Service By No Later Than May 5, 2025. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #133 ) Signed on 5/1/2025 (NB8)
Saturday, May 03, 2025
138 138 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 05/03 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 137 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, May 01, 2025
137 137 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Thu 05/01 5:19 PM
ORDER Granting Debtor/Debtor-In-Possession TTW Transports Ex Parte Motion To Continue Debtor's Chapter 11 Confirmation Hearing Pursuant To Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-1(m) And Continuing Status Conference. IT IS ORDERED: The Debtor's MOTION TO CONTINUE CHAPTER 11 CONFIRMATION HEARING Presently Scheduled For May 21, 2025 Shall Be CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 3, 2025 AT 1:30 P.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: That The New Briefing Deadlines Are As Follows: 1. JUNE 13, 2025: Last Day For Debtor To File And Serve An Amended Plan, Addressing The Filed Objections (Dockets131 And132 ). 2. JULY 11, 2025: Last Day For Creditors With Allowed Claims To Submit Ballots Accepting Or Rejecting Confirmation. 3. JULY 31, 2025: Last Day For Creditors With Allowed Claims To File Objections To Confirmation. 4. AUGUST 8, 2025: Last Day For Administrative Creditors To File Administrative Claim Fee Applications. 5. AUGUST 22, 2025: Last Day For Debtor To File Confirmation Brief, Including Any Reply To Objections To Confirmation And A Status Report. 6. SEPTEMBER 3, 2025 AT 1:30 P.M.: STATUS CONFERENCE and Hearing RE: CONFIRMATION OF DEBTOR'S CHAPTER 11 PLAN. IT IS FURTHER SO ORDERED: Debtor's Counsel Shall Give Written Notice Of This Order And File A Proof Of Service By No Later Than May 5, 2025. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/1/2025 (NB8)
Related: [-] 133