CreeLED, Inc. v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Raag Singhal |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-20881 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2024 |
Terminated: | Feb 18, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
tahwiq
|
|
Defendant
variety-dealsstore
|
|
Defendant
v6s0
|
|
Defendant
ultra-hids
|
|
Defendant
ufpiju
|
|
Defendant
tomeshale0
|
|
Defendant
tod287
|
|
Defendant
thedepot333
|
|
Defendant
tgrff
|
|
Defendant
tggyzk
|
|
Defendant
td3z
|
|
Defendant
tasha_traders_ltd
|
|
Defendant
veoc
|
|
Defendant
tabletpc2015
|
|
Defendant
stockbargains2021
|
|
Defendant
stictech co., ltd ,life Store
|
|
Defendant
songxiaolu23650
|
|
Defendant
shuorui
|
|
Defendant
shraga46
|
|
Defendant
shopping store
|
|
Defendant
sharonds2017
|
|
Defendant
sharon_magnezi
|
|
Defendant
xiiiiip
|
|
Defendant
zxc00908
|
|
Defendant
zvkrcm
|
|
Defendant
zk4r
|
|
Defendant
zj-autobulbs
|
|
Defendant
zhumanhong shop
|
|
Defendant
zhuaixia
|
|
Defendant
zhengShen
|
|
Defendant
zfryck
|
|
Defendant
youjinshuangstore
|
|
Defendant
yeboyebo
|
|
Defendant
yakmic.1v12h99x
|
|
Defendant
seeubestDirect
|
|
Defendant
xiaoma_store
|
|
Defendant
worlddeal888
|
|
Defendant
wjc656
|
|
Defendant
wizb
|
|
Defendant
wholesale8277
|
|
Defendant
wev8
|
|
Defendant
weitianhao3517
|
|
Defendant
wecus lighting factory direct Store
|
|
Defendant
we-sell-hids
|
|
Defendant
vickybabyswl
|
|
Defendant
jaln7 Official Store
|
|
Defendant
lyouyiq3
|
|
Defendant
lyouyid7
|
|
Defendant
lvlz
|
|
Defendant
love store-liang
|
|
Defendant
lexiess*store
|
|
Defendant
knutm3582uh
|
|
Defendant
kkgdii
|
|
Defendant
khelse LED Store
|
|
Defendant
keerydiscountstore
|
|
Defendant
lyshu81
|
|
Defendant
inabou89
|
|
Defendant
igetstore
|
|
Defendant
hxstartingline
|
|
Defendant
home light
|
|
Defendant
hert
|
|
Defendant
gtiudz
|
|
Defendant
gleskripniko_01
|
|
Defendant
gduc
|
|
Defendant
gbnb
|
|
Defendant
opticfireuk
|
|
Defendant
sanjumart3
|
|
Defendant
sam_lipscombe
|
|
Defendant
rouroumaoyi
|
|
Defendant
rgzs
|
|
Defendant
rekqaq
|
|
Defendant
qz46
|
|
Defendant
psyyy
|
|
Defendant
pocketmanLight Store
|
|
Defendant
paweinuo Official Store
|
|
Defendant
panasia2013
|
|
Defendant
osher1998uk
|
|
Defendant
gbbhg
|
|
Defendant
omqhcg
|
|
Defendant
omni588
|
|
Defendant
omagax
|
|
Defendant
obqx
|
|
Defendant
nomt
|
|
Defendant
nfirjsde4d
|
|
Defendant
n4uo
|
|
Defendant
mmjyt
|
|
Defendant
meng xiang xing qiu wen hua
|
|
Defendant
me-ta.em.al-in_0
|
|
Defendant
The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A
|
|
Defendant
1984maxtor
|
|
Defendant
A Super Store
|
|
Defendant
AIMENGTE Official Store
|
|
Defendant
ALLTRUE Official Store
|
|
Defendant
ANTEAM LIGHTING Store
|
|
Defendant
ANTRON ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
|
|
Defendant
AZ Instrument Store
|
|
Defendant
Ampper Direct
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anyrandy Store
|
|
Defendant
BLFM Flashlights Store
|
|
Defendant
BORUIT Official Store
|
|
Defendant
Banmeng Lighting Store Store
|
|
Defendant
CF Grow Official Store
|
|
Defendant
CYS(Guangzhou) Import&Export Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Co-co'sPet Store
|
|
Defendant
CoRui SmartHome Store
|
|
Defendant
CosyHomee Store
|
|
Defendant
Cutesliving Store
|
|
Defendant
DEEMOPA LED Store
|
|
Defendant
DN Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
Dawner Store
|
|
Defendant
Deanvile
|
|
Defendant
Doflamingos A Store
|
|
Defendant
Don't worry shopping
|
|
Defendant
EBLCL Factory Store
|
|
Defendant
Electronic_WonderlandUSA
|
|
Defendant
Evelobin Official Store
|
|
Defendant
FINECHAO Shop
|
|
Defendant
FULLEVER Official Store
|
|
Defendant
FanFun Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
Flashlights F1
|
|
Defendant
Fo Shan Shi Bin Min Long Mao Yi You Xian Gong Si
|
|
Defendant
Foshan Guyi Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
GIEX Store
|
|
Defendant
GOOD LED Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
GRACETOP
|
|
Defendant
GT Auto Parts Australia
|
|
Defendant
GUANGZHOU X-7SEVEN CO., LIMITED
|
|
Defendant
General Practical Tools Store
|
|
Defendant
Ging torch
|
|
Defendant
Give a light to the homes of the world Store
|
|
Defendant
GlobalGo Store
|
|
Defendant
Glowtec Xenon Store
|
|
Defendant
Good drink
|
|
Defendant
Guangyue Technology Store
|
|
Defendant
Guangzhou Coding Industry Co.,ltd
|
|
Defendant
HALOZEAL Store
|
|
Defendant
HDL Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
HEDELI Lighting Factory Store
|
|
Defendant
HHHot Store
|
|
Defendant
HINA Store
|
|
Defendant
HKC-SHOP
|
|
Defendant
HOMOLED Store
|
|
Defendant
HPCREELEDBULBS
|
|
Defendant
HT-Batteries
|
|
Defendant
HUXIAOJING
|
|
Defendant
Happy Light Store
|
|
Defendant
House Improvement 22 Store
|
|
Defendant
IP65 Light Store
|
|
Defendant
IWP Intelligent Store
|
|
Defendant
Illuminate The Light Store
|
|
Defendant
Island Sunset
|
|
Defendant
JJD Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
JOYON LAMP Store
|
|
Defendant
JUNIO43
|
|
Defendant
Jarmay - Store
|
|
Defendant
Jay LED Lighting Factory Discount Store
|
|
Defendant
Jessica Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
Jotong
|
|
Defendant
KASUO Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
KDULIT Factory Store
|
|
Defendant
KDULIT Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
KRMART
|
|
Defendant
Kinwope Store
|
|
Defendant
LCFOCUS Official Store
|
|
Defendant
LED Made In ZS Store
|
|
Defendant
LFWEIYK Official Store
|
|
Defendant
LIANG SHIFU Store
|
|
Defendant
LIGHTINGVIEW Official Store
|
|
Defendant
LIVOLO Switch Store
|
|
Defendant
LUFFYFIRE Official Store
|
|
Defendant
La casa di Panoramix
|
|
Defendant
Lidesens Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
Liming Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
Live And Exercise Store
|
|
Defendant
Lumia Outdoor Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
Lynnstore1
|
|
Defendant
MALITAI Choice Store
|
|
Defendant
MAT-US
|
|
Defendant
MDNG LED Store
|
|
Defendant
MIYU LED Store
|
|
Defendant
MYGICA
|
|
Defendant
Mateminco
|
|
Defendant
Max-CC
|
|
Defendant
MeiChuangYuan LED Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
Melbourne Electronic
|
|
Defendant
Mi Mijia Life Store
|
|
Defendant
Mundus Store
|
|
Defendant
NF LIGHTING Store
|
|
Defendant
NLSERoll Store
|
|
Defendant
Natvip
|
|
Defendant
Numensseth Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
ON THE ROAD Official Store
|
|
Defendant
ONELED Light Belt Store
|
|
Defendant
OPHIR
|
|
Defendant
Ohlite LED Self Operated Store
|
|
Defendant
P.A.5 STORE
|
|
Defendant
PDQ Dropshipping Store
|
|
Defendant
PIONEMAN Official Store
|
|
Defendant
PIPILIFEI Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
Paweinuo LED Light Store
|
|
Defendant
Paweinuo Lighting Super Factory Store
|
|
Defendant
Portable LED Light Store
|
|
Defendant
Preferred Original Product Store
|
|
Defendant
Premium LED Store
|
|
Defendant
QIDEWIN Car Light Store
|
|
Defendant
Qiwu Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
RY Optical Instrument Store
|
|
Defendant
Rabbit Hardware Store
|
|
Defendant
Retro-Grading-Shop
|
|
Defendant
Runh lighting factory Store Store
|
|
Defendant
Rxmax Official Store
|
|
Defendant
SAIFENLAN S-Light Store
|
|
Defendant
SEAFLO
|
|
Defendant
SOLOLANDOR Factory Dropshipping Store
|
|
Defendant
SUNMEIYI Ahour Store
|
|
Defendant
Sarah Hobbs Home and Garden
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Flexgreen Electronics Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Ocean Innovation Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Panda Grow Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Reis Lighting Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Ruo Lin Electronic Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Sincom Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shine Light Store
|
|
Defendant
ShinyYing Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1100035021 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102728876 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102777072 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102905066 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102905257 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102952027 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103039019 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1103311321 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop1942532 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop2883051 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop339632 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop5383194 Store
|
|
Defendant
Shop912427158 Store
|
|
Defendant
Sleep Wearing clothes Store
|
|
Defendant
Sofirn Official Store
|
|
Defendant
Sololandor Official Store
|
|
Defendant
StarSupplies786
|
|
Defendant
Starry Home Store
|
|
Defendant
Super Outdoor flashlight Store
|
|
Defendant
Szyoumyledlight
|
|
Defendant
THE EARTH GROWN COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
TNuemt
|
|
Defendant
The Era Of Science And Technology Store
|
|
Defendant
Tonight A Tomorrow Store
|
|
Defendant
Trade Center Store
|
|
Defendant
Treasure_Trove Mega Store
|
|
Defendant
TrustFire Accessories Store
|
|
Defendant
UDDALight Store
|
|
Defendant
UK&EU Deals
|
|
Defendant
UnusualTwo
|
|
Defendant
VastFire
|
|
Defendant
Velnox
|
|
Defendant
Viridihome Direct
|
|
Defendant
WIXOLighting Official Store
|
|
Defendant
WXL Store
|
|
Defendant
White Rose Tools
|
|
Defendant
Windnite (shenzhen) Technology Co., Limited
|
|
Defendant
XG Beauty Store
|
|
Defendant
You & me & he 888 Store
|
|
Defendant
ZHAOMINGYOU Store
|
|
Defendant
ZHIYU Lighting Store
|
|
Defendant
ZHUIGUANGZHE Store
|
|
Defendant
ZPAA Official Store
|
|
Defendant
ZYHY LED Lamps Store
|
|
Defendant
abki
|
|
Defendant
ai790
|
|
Defendant
ai804
|
|
Defendant
ai809
|
|
Defendant
ai810
|
|
Defendant
akgxt
|
|
Defendant
aliuhao
|
|
Defendant
aussiemarketotr
|
|
Defendant
bai10
|
|
Defendant
biguilaiintelligent
|
|
Defendant
brsal-9223
|
|
Defendant
bunnings
|
|
Defendant
bvvfcf
|
|
Defendant
cancer
|
|
Defendant
candy.bean
|
|
Defendant
car-parts-master
|
|
Defendant
catazer
|
|
Defendant
cdjz
|
|
Defendant
cdwc
|
|
Defendant
cfgtre
|
|
Defendant
cftgff
|
|
Defendant
chinastore07
|
|
Defendant
chinastore9527
|
|
Defendant
chricyhome
|
|
Defendant
cong08
|
|
Defendant
cvetishop
|
|
Defendant
cyc1688
|
|
Defendant
cypress99
|
|
Defendant
d.horse
|
|
Defendant
db56
|
|
Defendant
dera-technology
|
|
Defendant
dlvapes
|
|
Defendant
ds3927
|
|
Defendant
dulez
|
|
Defendant
edenleviloz123_2
|
|
Defendant
elephants.deals
|
|
Defendant
evyatazafran-0
|
|
Defendant
fqxt
|
|
Defendant
fukluksaufr
|
|
Plaintiff
CreeLED, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
shen zhen grace optoelectronics co.,ltd
Terminated: 06/11/2024
|
|
Defendant
sevenneonlighting Shenzhen Seven Neon Factory Wholsales Store
Terminated: 07/10/2024
|
|
Defendant
longhua Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
lightworld18
Terminated: 07/17/2024
|
|
Defendant
he-carlights
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
APMATAUTO Car Light Store
Terminated: 07/10/2024
|
|
Defendant
Bestpartsstore
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
CN_led Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
China Light Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Hailai088
Terminated: 07/10/2024
|
|
Defendant
Illuminate Life Store
Terminated: 07/10/2024
|
|
Defendant
Light of the city Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Magic Bright Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Mi Light Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Milight led Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Min-Fara
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
ModuleLive Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Niwalker Flashlight
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
One Lian ( LED) Technology Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 06/11/2024
|
|
Defendant
SAGE LU MEI Official Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
SHEN ZHEN ROYAL CO.,LTD
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Jnj Optoelectronics Co., Limited
Terminated: 07/17/2024
|
|
Defendant
Shop1102496132 Store
Terminated: 07/29/2024
|
|
Defendant
Shop5095116 Store
Terminated: 07/29/2024
|
|
Defendant
Viktorovna Viktorovna Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Viktorovna WS2812 Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Viktorovna zhzhe duoduo20 18 Store
Terminated: 06/20/2024
|
|
Defendant
Wuxi Kinglux Glass Lens Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 07/17/2024
|
|
Defendant
XENOLED
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
YI-FENG
Terminated: 07/29/2024
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Jiuyue Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 07/17/2024
|
|
Defendant
ZB TV LED bar Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
ZBLED Bars Store
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
fsanzhan2023
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
97 | 97
![]() DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of 1984maxtor, A Super Store, AIMENGTE Official Store, ALLTRUE Official Store, ANTEAM LIGHTING Store, ANTRON ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., APMATAUTO Car Light Store, AZ Instrument Store, Ampper Direct, Anyrandy Store, BLFM Flashlights Store, BORUIT Official Store, Banmeng Lighting Store Store, Bestpartsstore, CF Grow Official Store, CN_led Store, CYS(Guangzhou) Import&Export Trade Co., Ltd., China Light Store, Co-co'sPet Store, CoRui SmartHome Store, CosyHomee Store, Cutesliving Store, DEEMOPA LED Store, DN Lighting Store, Dawner Store, Deanvile, Doflamingos A Store, Don't worry shopping, EBLCL Factory Store, Electronic_WonderlandUSA, Evelobin Official Store, FINECHAO Shop, FULLEVER Official Store, FanFun Lighting Store, Flashlights F1, Fo Shan Shi Bin Min Long Mao Yi You Xian Gong Si, Foshan Guyi Electronic Technology Co., Ltd., GIEX Store, GOOD LED Lighting Store, GRACETOP, GT Auto Parts Australia, GUANGZHOU X-7SEVEN CO., LIMITED, General Practical Tools Store, Ging torch, Give a light to the homes of the world Store, GlobalGo Store, Glowtec Xenon Store, Good drink, Guangyue Technology Store, Guangzhou Coding Industry Co.,ltd, HALOZEAL Store, HDL Lighting Store, HEDELI Lighting Factory Store, HHHot Store, HINA Store, HKC-SHOP, HOMOLED Store, HPCREELEDBULBS, HT-Batteries, HUXIAOJING, Hailai088, Happy Light Store, House Improvement 22 Store, IP65 Light Store, IWP Intelligent Store, Illuminate Life Store, Illuminate The Light Store, Island Sunset, JJD Lighting Store, JOYON LAMP Store, JUNIO43, Jarmay - Store, Jay LED Lighting Factory Discount Store, Jessica Lighting Store, Jotong, KASUO Lighting Store, KDULIT Factory Store, KDULIT Lighting Store, KRMART, Kinwope Store, LCFOCUS Official Store, LED Made In ZS Store, LFWEIYK Official Store, LIANG SHIFU Store, LIGHTINGVIEW Official Store, LIVOLO Switch Store, LUFFYFIRE Official Store, La casa di Panoramix, Lidesens Lighting Store, Light of the city Store, Liming Lighting Store, Live And Exercise Store, Lumia Outdoor Lighting Store, Lynnstore1, MALITAI Choice Store, MAT-US, MDNG LED Store, MIYU LED Store, MYGICA, Magic Bright Store, Mateminco, Max-CC, MeiChuangYuan LED Lighting Store, Melbourne Electronic, Mi Light Store, Mi Mijia Life Store, Milight led Store, Min-Fara, ModuleLive Store, Mundus Store, NF LIGHTING Store, NLSERoll Store, Natvip, Niwalker Flashlight, Numensseth Lighting Store, ON THE ROAD Official Store, ONELED Light Belt Store, OPHIR, Ohlite LED Self Operated Store, One Lian ( LED) Technology Co., Ltd., P.A.5 STORE, PDQ Dropshipping Store, PIONEMAN Official Store, PIPILIFEI Lighting Store, Paweinuo LED Light Store, Paweinuo Lighting Super Factory Store, Portable LED Light Store, Preferred Original Product Store, Premium LED Store, QIDEWIN Car Light Store, Qiwu Lighting Store, RY Optical Instrument Store, Rabbit Hardware Store, Retro-Grading-Shop, Runh lighting factory Store Store, Rxmax Official Store, SAGE LU MEI Official Store, SAIFENLAN S-Light Store, SEAFLO, SHEN ZHEN ROYAL CO.,LTD, SOLOLANDOR Factory Dropshipping Store, SUNMEIYI Ahour Store, Sarah Hobbs Home and Garden, Shenzhen Flexgreen Electronics Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Jnj Optoelectronics Co., Limited, Shenzhen Ocean Innovation Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Panda Grow Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Reis Lighting Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Ruo Lin Electronic Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Sincom Electronic Technology Co., Ltd., Shine Light Store, ShinyYing Store, Shop1100035021 Store, Shop1102496132 Store, Shop1102728876 Store, Shop1102777072 Store, Shop1102905066 Store, Shop1102905257 Store, Shop1102952027 Store, Shop1103039019 Store, Shop1103311321 Store, Shop1942532 Store, Shop2883051 Store, Shop339632 Store, Shop5095116 Store, Shop5383194 Store, Shop912427158 Store, Sleep Wearing clothes Store, Sofirn Official Store, Sololandor Official Store, StarSupplies786, Starry Home Store, Super Outdoor flashlight Store, Szyoumyledlight, THE EARTH GROWN COMPANY, TNuemt, The Era Of Science And Technology Store, The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A, Tonight A Tomorrow Store, Trade Center Store, Treasure_Trove Mega Store, TrustFire Accessories Store, UDDALight Store, UK&EU Deals, UnusualTwo, VastFire, Velnox, Viktorovna Viktorovna Store, Viktorovna WS2812 Store, Viktorovna zhzhe duoduo20 18 Store, Viridihome Direct, WIXOLighting Official Store, WXL Store, White Rose Tools, Windnite (shenzhen) Technology Co., Limited, Wuxi Kinglux Glass Lens Co., Ltd., XENOLED, XG Beauty Store, YI-FENG, Yiwu Jiuyue Electronic Technology Co., Ltd., You & me & he 888 Store, ZB TV LED bar Store, ZBLED Bars Store, ZHAOMINGYOU Store, ZHIYU Lighting Store, ZHUIGUANGZHE Store, ZPAA Official Store, ZYHY LED Lamps Store, abki, ai790, ai804, ai809, ai810, akgxt, aliuhao, aussiemarketotr, bai10, biguilaiintelligent, brsal-9223, bunnings, bvvfcf, cancer, candy.bean, car-parts-master, catazer, cdjz, cdwc, cfgtre, cftgff, chinastore07, chinastore9527, chricyhome, cong08, cvetishop, cyc1688, cypress99, d.horse, db56, dera-technology, dlvapes, ds3927, dulez, edenleviloz123_2, elephants.deals, evyatazafran-0, fqxt, fsanzhan2023, fukluksaufr, gbbhg, gbnb, gduc, gleskripniko_01, gtiudz, he-carlights, hert, home light, hxstartingline, igetstore, inabou89, jaln7 Official Store, keerydiscountstore, khelse LED Store, kkgdii, knutm3582uh, lexiess*store, lightworld18, longhua Store, love store-liang, lvlz, lyouyid7, lyouyiq3, lyshu81, me-ta.em.al-in_0, meng xiang xing qiu wen hua, mmjyt, n4uo, nfirjsde4d, nomt, obqx, omagax, omni588, omqhcg, opticfireuk, osher1998uk, panasia2013, paweinuo Official Store, pocketmanLight Store, psyyy, qz46, rekqaq, rgzs, rouroumaoyi, sam_lipscombe, sanjumart3, seeubestDirect, sevenneonlighting Shenzhen Seven Neon Factory Wholsales Store, sharon_magnezi, sharonds2017, shen zhen grace optoelectronics co.,ltd, shopping store, shraga46, shuorui, songxiaolu23650, stictech co., ltd,life Store, stockbargains2021, tabletpc2015, tahwiq, tasha_traders_ltd, td3z, tggyzk, tgrff, thedepot333, tod287, tomeshale0, ufpiju, ultra-hids, v6s0, variety-dealsstore, veoc, vickybabyswl, we-sell-hids, wecus lighting factory direct Store, weitianhao3517, wev8, wholesale8277, wizb, wjc656, worlddeal888, xiaoma_store, xiiiiip, yakmic.1v12h99x, yeboyebo, youjinshuangstore, zfryck, zhengShen, zhuaixia, zhumanhong shop, zj-autobulbs, zk4r, zvkrcm, zxc00908 against CreeLED, Inc., PERMANENT INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
96 | 96
![]() NOTICE of Filing Revised Schedule A to Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment by CreeLED, Inc. (Guerra, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
95 | 95
![]() FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (amb) |
|
94 | 94
![]() ORDER granting73 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Schedule "A" containing a list of all non-settling Defendants by February 24, 2025. A Final Default Judgment will be entered by separate order upon filing of the Amended Schedule "A." The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case and DENY AS MOOT any pending motions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (amb) |
|
utility
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/18 11:49 AM
Civil Case Terminated per DE94 . (amb) |