Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth A Marra
Case #: 9:24-cv-80254
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Tim Quocksister
Defendant
Silver Arrow Cars, Ltd.
Defendant
0 to 60 Motorsports, LLC
Represented By
Roberto A. Torricella, Jr.
Torricella Law
contact info
Defendant
Cascio Dezine Solutions LLC
Represented By
Roberto A. Torricella, Jr.
Torricella Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Bourak Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By
Marc Aaron Wites
Wites Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Guarini
Represented By
Marc Aaron Wites
Wites Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 10/08 3:39 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. All pending motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (ir)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Mon 10/07 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
29 29 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 09/30 3:15 PM
ORDER re28 Notice of Settlement filed by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini. Stipulation of dismissal due by 10/15/24. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (ir)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Fri 08/16 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Fri 07/26 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
26 26 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Wed 07/17 4:03 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Tim Quocksister, 565 DAVID STREET VICTORIA BC, V8T 2C7, Canada. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 7/17/2024. (caw)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Wed 07/17 3:56 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Silver Arrow Cars, Ltd., 505 Fisgard Street, Victoria, BC V8W 1R3, Canada - Motions Terminated:23 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 7/17/2024. (caw)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Wed 07/17 3:52 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Tim Quocksister, 565 DAVID STREET VICTORIA BC, V8T 2C7, Canada - Motions Terminated:22 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 7/17/2024. (caw) Modified on 7/17/2024 (caw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
23 23 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Tue 07/16 2:50 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Silver Arrow Cars, Ltd. by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini. (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Tue 07/16 2:47 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Tim Quocksister by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini. (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 07/12 7:25 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS15 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and ( Responses due by 7/26/2024.), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 0 to 60 Motorsports, LLC, Cascio Dezine Solutions LLC. Attorney Roberto A. Torricella, Jr added to party 0 to 60 Motorsports, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Roberto A. Torricella, Jr added to party Cascio Dezine Solutions LLC(pty:dft).(Torricella, Roberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Joseph S. Cascio, Jr.,
Att: 2 Affidavit Raviv Chekroun
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
20 20 service Acknowledgment of Service Wed 06/12 5:41 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE to 0 to 60 Motorsports LLC filed by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini.(Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
19 19 service Acknowledgment of Service Wed 06/12 10:22 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Cascio Dezine Solutions LLC dba Cascio Motors filed by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini.(Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
18 18 service Summons Issued Wed 05/08 2:39 PM
Summons Issued as to 0 to 60 Motorsports, LLC, Cascio Dezine Solutions LLC. (jas)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Wed 05/08 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Cascio Dezine Solutions LLC dba Cascio Motors by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Wed 05/08 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to 0 to 60 Motorsports LLC by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Mon 05/06 4:07 PM
Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tim Quocksister, Silver Arrow Cars, Ltd., 0 to 60 Motorsports, LLC, Cascio Dezine Solutions LLC dba Cascio Motors filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini.(Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, May 03, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 05/03 8:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge . Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/3/2024. (ir)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Thu 05/02 9:55 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini.(Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
12 12 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 04/16 10:32 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re8 Summons Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service,9 Summons Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 10 , and 11 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
11 11 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 04/16 10:31 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to6 Summons Issued for Silver Arrow Cars, Ltd. filed by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini. (See DE#9 for document image). (jas)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 04/16 10:31 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to6 Summons Issued for Tim Quocksister filed by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini. (See DE#8 for document image). (jas)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service ABROAD/INTERNATIONAL Service Mon 04/15 4:41 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini. Silver Arrow Cars, Ltd. served on 4/5/2024, response/answer due 4/26/2024. (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service ABROAD/INTERNATIONAL Service Mon 04/15 4:38 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini. Tim Quocksister served on 4/5/2024, response/answer due 4/26/2024. (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Tue 04/02 10:09 AM
STATUS REPORT by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 03/19 5:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Tim Quocksister, Silver Arrow Cars, Ltd.. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 03/18 6:11 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Tim Quocksister by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 03/18 6:08 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Silver Arrow Cars, LTD by Robert Guarini (Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Fri 03/08 10:45 AM
Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (ir)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 03/07 10:52 AM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/06 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Tim Quocksister, Silver Arrow Cars, Ltd.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17348447, filed by Bourak Auto Sales, Inc., Robert Guarini.(Wites, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet