In Re: Robert W. Johnson
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew W Mcfarland |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00113 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2024 |
Case in other court: | USBC, 1:24mp00101 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 2:07 PM EDT |
Appellant
Robert W Johnson
65 Sidney Street
Buffalo, NY 14211 |
|
Interested Party
US Bankruptcy Court - Cincinnati
221 E. 4th Street Atrium Two Suite 800
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal
Tue 04/16 11:03 AM
Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 5/16/2024. Appellee Brief due by 6/17/2024. Appellant Reply Brief due by 7/1/2024. (Bias, Karrie) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 03/07 2:06 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh) |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Wed 03/06 2:41 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The parties briefing schedule will be established once the District Court receives the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Bankruptcy Court case number 1:24-mp-00101, filed by US Bankruptcy Court - Cincinnati. (Bias, Karrie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Transmittal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Docket, Order Being Appealed & Ntc of Appeal |