Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Noelle C Collins
Case #: 4:24-cv-00345
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 3:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Neighborhood Stabilization Team City of St. Louis, MO
Represented By
Rebecca Sandberg-Vossmeyer
St. Louis City Counselor'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelvin J. Jones
9721 Cambria Dr.
St. Louis, MO 63136

GPO Jul 01 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with copies of (1) the Employment Discrimination Complaint form, (2) the Motion for Appointment of Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Pro Bono Limited Scope Counsel form, and (3) the Motion and Order Concerning Appointment of Pro Bono Neutral form with the accompanying Financial Affidavit form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint as instructed in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 13) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that any motions for appointment of pro bono limited scope counsel or a pro bono neutral shall be filed no later than thirty (30) days prior to the ADR referral date. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 7/31/2024.). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 07/01/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Employment Discrimination Complaint, # (2) Motion for Appointment of Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Pro Bono, # (3) Motion and Order Concerning Appointment of Pro Bono Neutral)(KCD)
GPO Feb 18 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's second Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 34) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's Rehabilitation Act claims for discrimination, retaliation, and failure to accommodate will be allowed to proceed. All other claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on February 18, 2025. (BRP)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
61 61 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Mon 05/12 2:17 PM
ORDER : Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc.60 ). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the parties stipulate to the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 05/12/2025. (KCD)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 05/12 2:18 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 61. Mon May 12 14:18:09 CDT 2025 (KCD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
60 60 motion Dismiss Case Fri 05/09 8:58 AM
Final MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Kelvin J. Jones. (Duffe, Cira)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
59 59 misc Letter Wed 05/07 12:41 PM
Letter to Peter J. Dunne from Linda M. Zanders re:Disbursement. (KCD)
Related: [-]