Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:24-cv-00451
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Terminated:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 1:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Brian Stanko
28351 Silverton Drive
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677
Plaintiff
Brianna Beauty LLC.
Hitzke & Ferran LLP. 2110 East Flamingo Road Suite 206
Las Vegas, NV 89119
Represented By
Erick M Ferran
Hitzke & Ferran Llp.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 01, 2024
5 5 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/01 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Brianna Beauty LLC.. (Ferran, Erick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
order Standing Order Tue 03/12 8:41 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 4:32 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Stanko re1 Complaint. (JQC)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 03/11 4:30 PM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 03/06 4:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brianna Beauty LLC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ferran, Erick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/06 3:44 PM
First COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7609652) by Brianna Beauty LLC.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/16/2024. Proof of service due by 6/4/2024. (Ferran, Erick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits,
Att: 2 Summons Summons on Defendant,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet