California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-01829
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2024
Terminated:Apr 09, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24STCV02750
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
NPL Construction Co.
Represented By
Timothy A Pico
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Daniel Castaneda
Represented By
Romina Keshishyan
Rk Legal, PC
contact info
Arman Demirjian
Rk Legal, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
21 21 order Compel Arbitration Wed 04/10 3:26 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NPL CONSTRUCTION CO.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [filed 4/1/24; Docket No.16 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. This action is STAYED pending the outcome of the arbitration, and the Clerk is ordered to administratively close this case. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/08 3:44 PM
Notice OF PLAINTIFF DANIEL CASTANEDA'S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NPL CONSTRUCTION CO.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION filed by Plaintiff Daniel Castaneda. (Keshishyan, Romina)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/05 12:37 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Discovery cut-off 3/3/2025. Motions due by 4/7/2025. Motions in Limine to be filed by 5/14/2025. Status Report due by 5/14/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/27/2025. Jury Trial set for 6/17/2025 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2025 at 08:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2025 08:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 04/05 12:26 PM
ORDER VACATING SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on April 22, 2024 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby orders this case referred to: ADR Procedure No. 3: Private mediation. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 27, 2025. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference is due on: January 31, 2025. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
17 17 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 04/04 5:27 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant NPL Construction Co... (Pico, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
16 16 motion Compel Arbitration Mon 04/01 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant NPL Construction Co.. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Pico, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jason S. Wilcock,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ronda Germanson,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Work Referral and Administrative Dues Authorization,
Att: 5 Declaration of Timothy A. Pico,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2 - AAA Employment Arbitration and Mediation Procedures,
Att: 8 Exhibit 3 - CA IWC Wage Order 16,
Att: 9 Proposed Order
15 15 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/01 3:20 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daniel Castaneda, (Keshishyan, Romina)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
14 14 misc Statement Fri 03/29 3:40 PM
STATEMENT re LR 7-3 Pre-Filing Conference filed by Defendant NPL Construction Co. (Pico, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/25 12:01 PM
Notice of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Daniel Castaneda.(Keshishyan, Romina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
12 12 misc Declaration Mon 03/25 11:16 AM
DECLARATION of Romina Keshishyan of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Daniel Castaneda. (Keshishyan, Romina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
11 11 misc Declaration Mon 03/18 11:23 AM
DECLARATION of Timothy A. Pico of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant NPL Construction Co.. (Pico, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/15 9:46 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 03/15 9:44 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for April 22, 2024 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before April 5, 2024. (iv)
Related: [-]
8 8 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 03/15 8:58 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 100, inclusive.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
7 7 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Thu 03/14 4:35 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-01829 JFW(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/08 9:27 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/08 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/06 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant NPL Construction Co., (Pico, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/06 4:53 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant NPL Construction Co. identifying Centuri Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Pico, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/06 4:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant NPL Construction Co.. (Pico, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/06 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 24STCV02750 Receipt No: ACACDC-37045514 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant NPL Construction Co.. (Attorney Timothy A Pico added to party NPL Construction Co.(pty:dft))(Pico, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Timothy A. Pico,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jason S. Wilcock,
Att: 3 State Court Complaint,
Att: 4 Proof of Service of Summons,
Att: 5 State Court Answer
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/08 9:30 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, NPL Construction Co. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Castaneda. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/01/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 03/08 9:33 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant NPL Construction Co. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/04/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh)
Related: [-]