Orange Poppy, LLC
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Suzanne H Bauknight |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-30358 |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Debtor
Orange Poppy, LLC
7844 Cedarcrest Rd
Knoxville, TN 37938-4405 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Ann Mostoller
136 South Illinois Ave. Suite 104
Oak Ridge, TN 37830 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
800 Market Street, Suite 114 Howard H. Baker Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Knoxville, TN 37902 |
Docket last updated: 03/07/2024 12:03 AM EST |
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 03/06 2:38 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by William E. Maddox Jr. on behalf of Orange Poppy, LLC. (Maddox, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Wed 03/06 2:38 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by William E. Maddox Jr. on behalf of Debtor Orange Poppy, LLC. (Maddox, William) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN)
Wed 03/06 2:39 PM
Debtor Requests to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by William E. Maddox Jr. on behalf of Debtor Orange Poppy, LLC. (Maddox, William) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Wed 03/06 3:04 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/9/2024 at 01:30 PM via Zoom meeting - Ann Mostoller: Meeting ID 548 650 7008, Passcode 4572162795, (865) 350-6114. (Maddox, William) |
|
5 | 5
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 03/06 10:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:3:24-bk-30358] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23983559. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |