New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:24-cv-01365
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 22, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 03/22 10:06 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Erick Robertson DIN:17A1841 Sullivan Correctional Facility P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733-0115. ; and to Warden, Sullivan Correctional Facility (sha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case Thu 03/21 12:13 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/21/2024) (vn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 misc Prisoner Authorization Wed 03/20 4:23 PM
PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Erick Robertson.(sc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 03/07 10:56 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Erick Robertson DIN:17A1841 Sullivan Correctional Facility P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733-0115. (sac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Authorization Wed 03/06 4:53 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 4/5/2024. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/6/2024) (sha)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Wed 03/06 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/06 1:00 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Erick Robertson. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/06 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT against A. Escobar, A. Justiniano, William Keyser, E. Simmons, J. Sircable, Sullivan Correctional Facility. Document filed by Erick Robertson. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/06 2:02 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]