New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:24-cv-01689
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2024
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:36 AM EDT
Defendant
1412 Col, LLC
Defendant
Caren Abate
Defendant
Lymaris Albors
Defendant
Basic, Inc.,
Defendant
Aja Douglas
Defendant
NYCFO
Defendant
Promesa, Inc.
Defendant
Jamar Crow
Defendant
JSAF Management
Defendant
Joseph Safdieh
Defendant
Charles Staten
Plaintiff
Jimmy Avila
1412 College Avenue Apt. 1B
Bronx, NY 10456


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 11/07 3:02 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
9 9 order Judgment Wed 11/06 12:30 PM
CIVIL JUDGMENT that for the reasons stated in the Courts Order of Dismissal, this action is dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/6/2024) (tp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Package
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 11/06 10:45 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 8. Mailed to: Jimmy Avila 1412 College Avenue Apt. 1B Bronx, NY 10456. (ak)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 15 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 11/04 3:18 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL.... The Court dismisses this action for the reasons set forth in this order. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Court directs the Clerk of Court to enter a judgment dismissing this action for the reasons set forth in this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/25/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Fri 06/28 12:46 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jimmy Avila dated 6/24/2024 re: I am writing to bring an administrative matter to your attention regarding the above-mentioned case, Docket No. 24-CV-1689 (LTS). Document filed by Jimmy Avila.(sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/27 12:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against 1412 Col, LLC, Caren Abate, Lymaris Albors, Basic, Inc.,, Aja Douglas, NYCFO, Promesa, Inc., Lymaris Albors, Jamar Crow, Charles Staten, Joseph Safdieh, JSAF Management with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jimmy Avila. Related document:1 Complaint..(kgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 05/29 11:49 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Jimmy Avila 1412 College Avenue Apt. 1B Bronx, NY 10456. (nb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 15 pgs order Order 30 Days Amended Complaint (case opening) Tue 05/28 1:30 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO REPLEAD: Plaintiff's complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1), is dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted, see 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), with 30 days' leave to replead. To the extent Plaintiff is asserting in this action claims against Douglas, NYSOMH, and 1412 College Avenue, LLC, arising from the terms of the relocation agreement that he has previously raised in No. 24-CV-0884, the Court dismisses those claims without prejudice to Plaintiff litigating them, as permitted, in No. 24-CV-0884. Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunctive relief is denied without prejudice. (ECF 3.) The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction of Plaintiff's claims under state law. See 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/22/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 04/10 9:46 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Jimmy Avila 1412 College Avenue Apt. 1B Bronx, NY 10456. (nb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Tue 04/09 4:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/9/2024) (vn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Mon 04/08 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause - Unsigned Wed 03/06 10:13 AM
UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Jimmy Avila..(rdz)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/06 10:12 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jimmy Avila..(rdz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/06 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against 1412 Col, LLC, Caren Abate, Lymaris Albors, Basic, Inc.,, Aja Douglas, NYCFO, Promesa, Inc.. Document filed by Jimmy Avila..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/06 10:07 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]