Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean F Cox
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:24-cv-10554
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Terminated:Jun 03, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 06/25 3:18 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Omar Pouncy re6 Order Dismissing Case (LGra)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
7 7 order Judgment* Mon 06/03 1:13 PM
JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Dismissing Case Mon 06/03 1:06 PM
OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 06/03 1:14 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re7 Judgment and6 Order on Omar Rashad Pouncy 175266, Saginaw County Jail, 311 S. Harrison St., Saginaw, MI 48602 (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
5 5 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/20 2:28 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Omar Rashad Pouncy re2 Order to Correct Deficiency (Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only) (DAll)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/20 2:27 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Omar Rashad Pouncy re3 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (DAll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
3 3 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Thu 03/07 3:38 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MSyl)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Correct Deficiency - Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only Thu 03/07 2:13 PM
ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Correction due by 4/8/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 03/06 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Omar Rashad Pouncy against All Defendants (MCho)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet