California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00902
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 11:37 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
7567 El Cajon Blvd #4 La Mesa, California 91941 (Target Location) (1)
Terminated: 03/05/2024


Docket last updated: 03/07/2024 12:21 AM PST
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to 7567 El Cajon Blvd #4 La Mesa, California 91941 (Target Location). (rlw)
Related: [-]