New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:14-cv-09181
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Equal Rights Under the Law
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2014
Terminated:Jan 09, 2015
Last checked: Sunday May 17, 2015 7:35 AM EDT
Defendant
LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton Inc.
Defendant
Sephora USA, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jiali Chen
Represented By
Douglas Holden Wigdor
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J. Chen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
David Evan Gottlieb
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Xiao Xiao
Represented By
Douglas Holden Wigdor
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J. Chen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
David Evan Gottlieb
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Man Xu
Represented By
Douglas Holden Wigdor
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J. Chen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
David Evan Gottlieb
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiantian Zou
Represented By
Douglas Holden Wigdor
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J. Chen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
David Evan Gottlieb
Wigdor LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 02, 2015
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Thu 04/02 2:40 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 7 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (mro)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 12, 2015
6 6 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Mon 01/12 5:04 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Plaintiffs Xiao Xiao, Jiali Chen, Man Xu and Tiantian Zou, by and through undersigned counsel, hereby give notice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the voluntary dismissal of the above-captioned action, without prejudice. Defendants Sephora USA, Inc. and LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton Inc. have not served any responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The Clerk of the Court Shall mark this action closed and all pending motions denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/12/2015) (tn) Modified on 1/12/2015 (tn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 09, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/09 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton Inc., Sephora USA, Inc.. Document filed by Jiali Chen, Man Xu, Xiao Xiao, Tiantian Zou. (Gottlieb, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 05, 2015
4 4 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 01/05 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen on behalf of Jiali Chen, Xiao Xiao, Man Xu, Tiantian Zou. New Address: Wigdor LLP, 85 Fifth Avenue - Fifth Floor, New York, NY, 10003, (212) 257-6800. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 19, 2014
3 3 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 12/19 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/2/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/19/2014) (tn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 18, 2014
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/21 10:25 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/21 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT against LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton Inc., Sephora USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401110028)Document filed by Jiali Chen, Man Xu, Xiao Xiao, Tiantian Zou.(moh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 11/21 10:24 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton Inc., Sephora USA, Inc.. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 11/21 10:24 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 11/21 10:24 AM
Case Designated ECF. (moh)
Related: [-]