New York Southern District Court
Judge:William H Pauley, III
Case #: 1:14-cv-09182
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2014
Terminated:Jan 28, 2015
Last checked: Sunday May 17, 2015 7:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Joe Bob Outfitters, LLC
Plaintiff
Geissele Automatics, LLC
Represented By
Lee A. Goldberg
Merchant & Gould P.C.
contact info
Dianna G El Hioum
Merchant & Gould P.C.
contact info
Benjamin Henry Graf
Merchant & Gould, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
WHG Properties, LLC
Represented By
Lee A. Goldberg
Merchant & Gould P.C.
contact info
Dianna G El Hioum
Merchant & Gould P.C.
contact info
Benjamin Henry Graf
Merchant & Gould, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Thursday, January 29, 2015
misc Mail Trademark Form (case terminated) Thu 01/29 10:37 AM
Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the termination of this action. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 28, 2015
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/28 12:41 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Joe Bob Outfitters, LLC. Document filed by Geissele Automatics, LLC, WHG Properties, LLC. (Goldberg, Lee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 18, 2014
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/21 10:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/21 10:54 AM
COMPLAINT against Joe Bob Outfitters, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401110031)Document filed by Geissele Automatics, LLC, WHG Properties, LLC.(moh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 11/21 10:57 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joe Bob Outfitters, LLC. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 11/21 10:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 11/21 10:58 AM
Case Designated ECF. (moh)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Trademark Form (case opening) Fri 11/21 11:03 AM
Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (moh)
Related: [-]