New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Steven Tiscione
Case #: 2:24-cv-01702
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Early Warning Services, LLC
Represented By
Robert M. Tucker
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Sarah Zucco
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tara Passoni
Represented By
Russell Evan Adler
Law Offices Of Russell E. Adler PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, August 29, 2024
17 17 respoth Reply in Support Thu 08/29 5:11 PM
REPLY in Support re15 Memorandum in Support filed by Early Warning Services, LLC. (Zucco, Sarah)
Related: [-]
16 16 respoth Reply in Opposition Thu 08/29 5:10 PM
REPLY in Opposition re15 Memorandum in Support filed by Early Warning Services, LLC. (Zucco, Sarah)
Related: [-]
15 15 17 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 08/29 5:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re14 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss filed by Early Warning Services, LLC. (Zucco, Sarah)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss Thu 08/29 5:05 PM
Notice of MOTION to Dismiss by Early Warning Services, LLC. (Zucco, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
13 13 minutes Pre Motion Conference Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 06/06 5:52 PM
Minute Order for Pre Motion Conference held on 6/6/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Adler for Plaintiff; Zucco for Defendant. Defendant's Letter Motion for pre-motion conference11 is terminated as it was improperly filed as a motion instead of a response. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: Defendant shall serve the motion on Plaintiff by July 8, 2024; Plaintiff shall serve the opposition on Defendant by August 9, 2024; Defendant shall serve the Reply and file the fully-briefed motion on ECF by August 29, 2024. (Cisco (2:00 - 2:15).) (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 05/16 11:47 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held at 2:00 p.m. on June 6, 2024 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/16/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
12 12 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/15 12:57 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (TLH)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 05/15 11:19 AM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in opposition to Defendant's request for pre-motion conference to dismiss by Tara Passoni. (Adler, Russell)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/15 10:35 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Early Warning Services, LLC. (Zucco, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 05/13 11:39 AM
ORDER deferring ruling on9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By May 15, 2024, counsel shall either complete and file the appropriate form consenting to the undersigned continue as the sole remaining judge presiding on the case or a letter stating that the parties do not consent to the aforementioned. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/13/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
9 9 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 05/08 4:08 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Early Warning Services, LLC. (Zucco, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/14 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Tucker on behalf of Early Warning Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Tucker, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/14 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Zucco on behalf of Early Warning Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Zucco, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/13 11:58 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Stiplulation of parties by Tara Passoni. (Adler, Russell)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/13 4:53 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Stipulation of parties : Early Warning Services, LLC answer due 5/8/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/13/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 03/07 3:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Early Warning Services, LLC. (LJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Thu 03/07 3:39 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 03/07 3:36 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/07 1:20 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Tara Passoni (Adler, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/07 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Early Warning Services LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17644421 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Tara Passoni. (Adler, Russell)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/07 3:38 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]