Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:24-cv-00367
Nature of Suit130 Contract - Miller Act
Cause40:0270 Miller Act
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Terminated:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Clark Construction Group, LLC
7500 Old Georgetown Road
Bethesda, MD 20814
Defendant
Ronco Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
8916 Simpson Lane
Clinton, MD 20735
Defendant
United Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff
ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc.
United States of America for the use and benefit of ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc. 4510 Graphics Drive
White Plains, MD 20695
Represented By
James Durling Fullerton
Fullerton & Knowles, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Thu 06/06 9:07 AM
ADJUDGED, ORDERED and DECREED that this cause may and hereby is now dismissed with prejudice in re12 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/5/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Voluntarily Wed 06/05 4:41 PM
MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc..(Fullerton, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 20, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Mon 05/20 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc. (Fullerton, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/26 2:55 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that the deadline for defendants to file responsive pleadings to plaintiff's Complaint be and is EXTENDED to Monday, May 20, 2024. No further extension will be granted. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 04/26/2024. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/26 2:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc.. (Fullerton, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/01 8:07 AM
ORDERED that the deadline for defendants to file responsive pleadings to plaintiff's Complaint be and is EXTENDED to Tuesday, April 30, 2024 in re7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed . Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/1/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/29 5:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc.. (Fullerton, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 03/08 9:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Clark Construction Group, LLC, Ronco Mechanical Contractors, Inc., United Fire & Casualty Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Thursday, March 07, 2024
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 03/07 3:09 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc.. (Fullerton, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Thu 03/07 2:12 PM
Proposed Summons United Fire & Casualty Co. by ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc.. (Fullerton, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 03/07 2:09 PM
Proposed Summons to Ronco Mechanical Contractors, Inc. by ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc.. (Fullerton, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 03/07 2:06 PM
Proposed Summons by ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc.. (Fullerton, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/07 1:19 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9402820.), filed by ADJ Sheet Metal, Inc..(Fullerton, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 03/08 9:11 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (dvanm)
Related: [-]