Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 9:24-cv-80262
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, May 23, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 05/23 10:06 AM
ORDER CLOSING CASE AND DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/21/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Mon 05/20 9:00 AM
JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Appliction, LLC, EB5 Affiliate Network Southeast Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN SE Regional Center, LLC(Sosa, Jose) Modified text on 5/20/2024 (ebz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Friday, May 10, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 05/10 11:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY AND STAYING CASE re10 Motion to Stay. This matter is STAYED until June 10, 2024. Any scheduled hearings are CANCELED, any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, and all deadlines except those identified in this Order are TERMINATED. Status Report due by 6/7/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
10 10 motion Stay Thu 05/09 4:16 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay re1 Complaint, by Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS). Attorney Monica L. Haddad added to party Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS)(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/23/2024.(Haddad, Monica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 14, 2024
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned EXECUTED AS TO USA DFTS Thu 03/14 5:34 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Appliction, LLC, EB5AN SE Regional Center, LLC, EB5 Affiliate Network Southeast Regional Center, LLC. Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 3/14/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024. (Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 03/11 4:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ebz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s)
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 03/11 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Appliction, LLC, EB5 Affiliate Network Southeast Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN SE Regional Center, LLC (Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 03/11 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Appliction, LLC, EB5 Affiliate Network Southeast Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN SE Regional Center, LLC (Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 03/11 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Appliction, LLC, EB5 Affiliate Network Southeast Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN SE Regional Center, LLC (Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/08 8:44 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE (Civil Cover Sheet) by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Appliction, LLC, EB5 Affiliate Network Southeast Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN SE Regional Center, LLC re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Fri 03/08 8:27 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (amb)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 03/08 8:26 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. (amb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/07 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS). Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17351964, filed by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Appliction, LLC, EB5AN SE Regional Center, LLC, EB5 Affiliate Network Southeast Regional Center, LLC.(Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]